Member Case
Lead case is: 1:14-bk-11802

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:14-bk-11804
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2014

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Aramid Entertainment, Inc.
201 E 42nd St Fl 21
New York, NY 10017-5735
Represented By
James C. McCarroll
Reed Smith, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 06/16/2014 2:45 PM EDT
Friday, June 13, 2014
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 06/13 10:14 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 14-11804 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10152829. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
1 1 11 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 06/13 10:11 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/14/2014, Disclosure Statement due by 10/14/2014, Initial Case Conference due by 7/14/2014, Filed by James C. McCarroll of Reed Smith, LLP on behalf of Aramid Entertainment, Inc.. (McCarroll, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 ans Declaration Fri 06/13 11:07 PM
Declaration of Geoffrey Varga In Support of Chapter 11 Petition And First Day Pleadings filed by James C. McCarroll on behalf of Aramid Entertainment, Inc.. (McCarroll, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Motion, Joint Administration Fri 06/13 11:18 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by James C. McCarroll on behalf of Aramid Entertainment, Inc.. (McCarroll, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
4 4 motion Motion, Extend Deadline to File Schedules Fri 06/13 11:34 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information /Motion For An Order Extending The Time For The Debtors To File Their Schedules And Statements of Financial Affairs filed by James C. McCarroll on behalf of Aramid Entertainment, Inc.. (McCarroll, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
5 5 motion Application, Employ Fri 06/13 11:52 PM
Application to Employ Reed Smith LLP as Bankruptcy Counsel /Application For An Order Authorizing The Debtors To Employ And Retain Reed Smith LLP As Bankruptcy Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc To The Petition Date filed by James C. McCarroll on behalf of Aramid Entertainment, Inc.. (McCarroll, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
6 6 motion Application, Employ Sat 06/14 12:15 AM
Application to Employ Kinetic Partners as Crisis Managers /Application For An Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 363 To Employ And Retain Kinetic Partners (Cayman) Limited As Crisis Managers Nunc Pro Tunc To The Petition Date filed by James C. McCarroll on behalf of Aramid Entertainment, Inc.. (McCarroll, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C