Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barry S Schermer
Case #: 4:14-bk-44811
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Jul 23, 2014
Claims Deadline:Aug 25, 2014
Terminated:Oct 31, 2016
Plan Confirmed:May 13, 2016
Discharge Objection Deadline:Sep 22, 2014

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Jamat, LLC
2597 Breakwater Dr
Imperial, MO 63052-4319
Represented By
Spencer P. Desai
Desai Eggmann Mason LLC
contact info
Danielle A. Suberi
Desai Eggmann Mason LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee
111 South Tenth Street Suite 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102
Represented By
Paul A. Randolph
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 43 seconds ago
Thursday, November 10, 2016
239 239 misc Certificate of Service Thu 11/10 12:21 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Jamat, LLC Related [+]. (Suberi, Danielle)
Related: [-] 237 Order on Motion for Final Decree
Att: 1 Appendix Creditor Matrix