Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:14-bk-44811

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barry S Schermer
Case #: 4:15-ap-04106
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2015
Terminated:Aug 05, 2015
Last checked: never
Defendant
Total Merchant Services Inc
Represented By
Bonnie L. Clair
Summers Compton Wells LLC
contact info
Defendant
Global Payments Direct Inc
Represented By
Bonnie L. Clair
Summers Compton Wells LLC
contact info
Defendant
HSBC Bank USA NA
Represented By
HSBC Bank USA NA
contact info
Plaintiff
Jamat, LLC
2597 Breakwater Drive
Imperial, MO 63052
Represented By
Spencer P. Desai
Desai Eggmann Mason LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, August 07, 2015
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/07 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 08/07/2015. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/07 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 08/07/2015. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, August 05, 2015
13 13 order Judgment Wed 08/05 12:24 PM
Judgment Related [+]. (sch, m)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jamat, LLC
12 12 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 08/05 12:22 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] (sch, m)
Related: [-] 11
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 08/05 12:28 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-4106 Dismissed (sch, m)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/05 12:29 PM
Adversary Case 4:15-ap-4106 Closed (sch, m)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2015
11 11 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 08/04 11:23 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Jamat, LLC (Suberi, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2015
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/22 4:03 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Jamat, LLC Related [+]. (Desai, Spencer)
Related: [-] 9 Scheduling Order
Monday, July 20, 2015
9 9 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/20 3:40 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/5/2015 at 02:00 PM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 5 North. (sch, m)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jamat, LLC
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
court Hearing Continued Mon 07/20 12:47 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/5/2015 at 02:00 PM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 5 North. (abe, w)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jamat, LLC
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
8 8 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Bonnie L. Clair Filed by Defendants Global Payments Direct Inc, Total Merchant Services Inc. (Clair, Bonnie)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 06, 2015
7 7 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 06/06/2015. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3
Friday, June 05, 2015
6 6 Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Jamat, LLC Related [+]. (Desai, Spencer)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Scheduling Order,4 Summons Issued
5 5 Summons Service Executed on Global Payments Direct Inc 6/4/2015; HSBC Bank USA NA 6/4/2015; Total Merchant Services Inc 6/4/2015 (Desai, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2015
4 4 Summons Issued on Global Payments Direct Inc Date Issued 6/4/2015, Answer Due 7/6/2015; HSBC Bank USA NA Date Issued 6/4/2015, Answer Due 7/6/2015; Total Merchant Services Inc Date Issued 6/4/2015, Answer Due 7/6/2015 Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/1/2015 at 02:00 PM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 5 North. (abe, w)
Related: [-]
3 3 Scheduling Order Related [+]. Evidentiary Hearing to be held on 6/10/2015 at 09:30 AM Bankruptcy Courtroom 5 North for1 , (nel, d)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jamat, LLC
Tuesday, June 02, 2015
2 2 Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 15-04106 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 11602511, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 Adversary case 15-04106 Complaint by Jamat, LLC (attorney Spencer P. Desai ) against Total Merchant Services, Inc., Global Payments Direct, Inc., HSBC Bank USA, N.A. Fee Amount $350.(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(71 (Injunctive relief - imposition of stay)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other))(Desai, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Att: 6 Exhibit E
Att: 7 Exhibit F
Att: 8 Exhibit G
Att: 9 Exhibit H
Att: 10 Exhibit I
Att: 11 Exhibit J