Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-30229

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Dennis Montali
Case #: 3:21-ap-03004
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2021
Terminated:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By
J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda S. Green, Trustee in Bankruptcy of the Estate of Richard M. Glantz, Inc.
P.O. Box 2949
San Anselmo, CA 94979
Represented By
John H. MacConaghy
Macconaghy And Barnier
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/20 12:49 PM
Adversary Case Closed 3:21-ap-3004. (rdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/19 3:11 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Case Management Action due after 03/4/2024. Filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green. (Barnier, Jean)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
23 23 audio audio Fri 08/26 10:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/26/2022 1:30:00 AM ]. File Size [ 3895 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:16:14 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held (Adv) Fri 08/26 1:41 PM
Hearing Held. The matter has settled. The scheduling conference is taken off calendar. Related [+] (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Linda S. Green
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
22 22 misc Certificate/Report of BDRP Conference Wed 08/10 5:06 PM
Certificate/Report of BDRP Conference. Conference Was held on 8/3/2022. A Settlement Was Reached. Related [+]. Filed by Resolution Advocate Peter C.(ra) Califano (Califano, Peter)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Stipulation
Monday, June 27, 2022
21 21 order Stipulation Mon 06/27 2:44 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference Related [+]. (lp)
Related: [-] 19 Stipulation to Continue Hearing filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green
20 20 order Stipulation Mon 06/27 12:17 PM
Order Appointing Resolution Advocate and Assignment to the Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (Peter Califano is appointed as Resolution Advocate and Michael Sweet is appointed as the Alternate) Related [+]. (lp)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green
Friday, June 17, 2022
19 19 stip Continue Hearing Fri 06/17 8:49 PM
Stipulation to Continue Hearing Filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/26/2022 at 01:30 PM Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars for 1 ,. (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green, Hearing Continued
18 18 stip Miscellaneous Relief Fri 06/17 8:44 PM
Stipulation, for Appointment of BDRP Resolution Advocate Filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green. (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
17 17 audio audio Fri 04/29 10:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/29/2022 1:30:00 PM ]. File Size [ 77796 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:21:02 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Fri 04/29 3:54 PM
Hearing held and continued. John MacConaghy appeared for the plaintiff. Chirstopher Rivas appeared for the defendant. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2022 at 01:30 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Linda S. Green
Saturday, April 23, 2022
16 16 misc Status Conference Statement Sat 04/23 9:19 PM
Status Conference Statement Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-] Hearing Continued
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Tue 12/14 11:45 AM
Hearing Continued. The scheduling conference on 12/17/21 is continued to 4/29/22 at 1:30 p.m. per the Court's 12/13 Docket Text Order. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2022 at 01:30 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Linda S. Green
Monday, December 13, 2021
15 15 misc Status Conference Statement Mon 12/13 11:11 AM
Status Conference Statement Related [+] . Filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green (MacConaghy, John). CORRECTIVE ENTRY:Clerk added linkage to document #4. Modified on 12/13/2021 (klr)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
order Judge Docket Order Mon 12/13 11:30 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) Based upon the representations of counsel for the Plaintiff in the December 13, 2021, Plaintiff's Status Report (Dkt 15), the Scheduling Conference, now set for December 17, 2021, is CONTINUED to April 29, 2022, at 1:30 PM. (Montali, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Fri 10/29 5:29 PM
Hearing held and continued. John McConaghy appeared for plaintiff. Christopher Rivas appeared for defendant. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2021 at 01:30 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Linda S. Green
Friday, October 22, 2021
14 14 misc Status Conference Statement Fri 10/22 3:40 PM
Status Conference Statement Related [+]. Filed by Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Rivas, Christopher)
Related: [-] Hearing Continued,13 Status Conference Statement
13 13 misc Status Conference Statement Fri 10/22 3:13 PM
Status Conference Statement Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-] Hearing Continued
Thursday, April 01, 2021
12 12 misc Statement Thu 04/01 12:47 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosures . Filed by Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Rivas, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
11 11 audio audio Fri 03/26 10:30 PM
The Audio File attached to the PDF includes several hearings. Court Date & Time [ 3/26/2021 1:30:00 AM ]. File Size [ 148063 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:34:14 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Fri 03/26 4:23 PM
Hearing Held and Continued. John MacConaghy appeared on behalf of plaintiff. Christopher Rivas appeared on behalf of the defendant. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 at 01:30 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Linda S. Green
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/09 6:09 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Rivas, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
9 9 order Stipulation Thu 03/04 2:12 PM
Order on Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint to Avoid Fraudulent Transfers Related [+]. (lp)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation to Extend Time filed by Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
8 8 stip Extend Time Wed 03/03 7:55 AM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. Related [+]. (Rivas, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green
Monday, February 22, 2021
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 02/22 12:44 PM
Summons Service Executed on J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. 1/18/2021 . (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 16, 2021
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/16 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 01/16/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/16 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 01/16/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Discovery Order
Thursday, January 14, 2021
4 4 court Summons Issued Thu 01/14 3:51 PM
Summons Issued on J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. Answer Due 2/16/2021 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/26/2021 at 01:30 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (rs)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green
3 3 order Discovery Thu 01/14 3:36 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (rs) NOTE: Page 3-4 are duplicates of Page 1-2. Modified on 1/14/2021 (rs)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Discovery Thu 01/14 3:16 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (rs) NOTE: Clerk docketed in error. NOTE: The BNC Notice will not be generated. Modified on 1/14/2021 (rs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/13 2:49 PM
Adversary case[LINK 21-03004 . 13 Related [+], 14 Complaint by Linda S. Green, Trustee against JP Morgan Chase Bank. Fee Amount $350. (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet