Y.S. et al v. New York City Department of Education
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00711 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 20:1400 IDEA: Individuals With Disabilities Education Act (short title) |
Case Filed: | Jan 26, 2021 |
Re-opened: | Oct 13, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 25, 2021 4:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
New York City Department of Education
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Y. S.
on behalf of Y.F. and S.F., children with disabilities 535 Wales Ave. Apt. 2A
Bronx, NY 10455 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, October 06, 2023 | ||
117 | 117
appeal
USCA Order - Other
Fri 10/06 2:39 PM
ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Notices of Appeal. USCA Case Number 22-1184 L). On June 21, 2023, the Court determined 15 tandem appeals under the caption H.C., individually and on behalf of J.C., a Child with a Disability v. New York City Board of Education, 21-1582 Eighteen additional appeals raising issues similar to those determined inH.C. were remanded to the district court for further proceedings following the issuance of a decision in H.C. The remand orders stated that following the district courts entry of final judgment either party could restore jurisdiction to the Court of Appeals by filing a letter stating that it seeks further appellate review. See United States v. Jacobson, 15. F.3d 19 (2d Cir. 1994). On August 2, 2023, at the parties' request, the Court issued a case management order regarding the restoration of jurisdiction in the remanded cases. Following that order, in two separate cases, which raise issues similar to those to be determined in the remanded cases, notices of appeal were filed in the first instance. Those appeals are listed above as 23-1206 and 23-1222 Appellants have moved for a case management order regarding the above-referenced appeals. The New York City Department of Education does not oppose the motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-referenced remanded appeals are reinstated. All the listed appeals will be heard in tandem by one panel. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Order: 10/6/2023. Certified: 10/6/2023..(nd) |