Original Case: 1:04-cv-00936

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:14-cv-02111
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2014
Terminated:Aug 10, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2016 7:41 AM EST
Defendant - Appellant
Republic of Argentina
Represented By
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Hickory Securities Ltd.
Represented By
Michael Todd Mobley
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Scullion
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Michael Diaz Jr.
Diaz Reus & Targ LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Ruben Chorny
Represented By
Michael Todd Mobley
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Scullion
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Bertrand C. Sellier
Rottenberg Lipman Rich, P.C.
contact info

GPO Aug 10 2015
OPINION, vacating the distict court judgment and remanding the cases, by PNL, CJS, RR, C.JJ., FILED.[1572269] [14-2104, 14-2105, 14-2106, 14-2107, 14-2108, 14-2109, 14-2111, 14-2112]

Docket last updated: 01/09/2016 6:05 AM EST
Wednesday, June 18, 2014
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. [1251603] 14-2111 [Entered: 06/18/2014 03:25 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/24/2014, RECEIVED.[1251605] 14-2111 [Entered: 06/18/2014 03:27 PM]
Related: [-]