New York Southern District Court
Judge:Loretta A Preska
Case #: 1:04-cv-00936
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1603 Suit on Loan Agreements
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2004
Terminated:Jan 09, 2009
Last checked: Sunday Apr 07, 2019 2:29 PM EDT
Applicant
Guillermo A Gleizer
Represented By
Michael Champlin Spencer
Milberg Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
The Republic of Argentina
Represented By
Daniel Slifkin
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Damaris Hernandez
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr
Cleary Gottlieb
contact info
Michael A Paskin
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Jonathan I. Blackman
Cleary Gottlieb
contact info
Intervenor
Pablo Giancaterino
Miscellaneous
The individual persons and entities listed in Annex A
Notice Only
Andrarex, Ltd.
Represented By
Andrea Boggio
Bryant University
contact info
Plaintiff
Hickory Securities Ltd.
Represented By
Gary Edward Davidson
Diaz, Reus, & Targ, LLP
contact info
Saul Roffe
Sirota & Sirota, Llp(queens)
contact info
Margaret T. Perez
Diaz, Reus, & Targ, LLP
contact info
William Henry Weisman
Proskauer Rose Llp (nyc)
contact info
David A. Picon
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Guillermo Ariel Gleizer
Guillermo A. Gleizer, Esq.
contact info
Michael Diaz, Jr.
Diaz, Reus, & Targ, LLP
contact info
Carlos F. Gonzalez
Diaz, Reus, & Targ, LLP
contact info
Michael Todd Mobley
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Stephen Michael Ahron
Proskauer Rose Llp (ny)
contact info
Steven E. Obus
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Bertrand Charles Sellier
Vandenberg & Feliu, LLP
contact info
Marta Colomar Garcia
Diaz, Reus, & Targ, LLP
contact info
Jennifer R. Scullion
Proskauer Rose Llp (nyc)
contact info
Alexander Reus
Diaz Reus
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
misc Mail Order by USPS Tue 06/14 9:38 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 329. Mailed to: Pablo Giancaterino Alicia Moreau de Justo 740 Piso 3, Officina 1 Buenas Aires, CP 1107AAP Argentina. (kh)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
329 329 2 pgs order Order Mon 06/13 2:05 PM
ORDER withdrawing [444 in 1:04-cv-00400-LAP] Motion re: 444 MOTION FOR EXCLUSION FROM APRIL 2016 CLASS SETTLEMENT., [453 1:04-cv-00400-LAP] MOTION to Withdraw [443 1:04-cv-00400-LAP] Notice (Other) Notice of Withdrawal of Alexander Neuhauser's Motion for Exclusion from Class Settlement.; granting [453 1:04-cv-00400-LAP] Motion to Withdraw 444 MOTION FOR EXCLUSION FROM APRIL 2016 CLASS SETTLEMENT., [453 1:04-cv-00400-LAP] MOTION to Withdraw [443 1:04-cv-00400-LAP] Notice (Other) Notice of Withdrawal of Alexander Neuhauser's Motion for Exclusion from Class Settlement. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court shall mark as closed the open motions at dkt. nos. 444 and 453. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/13/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]