Original Case: 7:19-cr-00497

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cr-00198
Typecriminal / interlocutory
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2021
Terminated:Sep 20, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Aug 11, 2022 7:49 PM EDT
Appellee USA
United States of America
Represented By
Jamie Bagliebter
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New
contact info
James Ligtenberg
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New
contact info
Won S. Shin
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New
contact info
Samuel Adelsberg
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New
contact info
Defendant
Nachman Helbrans
Defendant
Aron Rosner, AKA Aaron Rosner
Defendant
Jacob Rosner, AKA Chaim Rosner
Defendant
Matityau Moshe Malka
Defendant
Shmiel Weingarten
Defendant
Yoil Weingarten, AKA Yole Weingarten, AKA Yoel Weingarten
Defendant
Yakov Wiengarten, AKA Yaakov Weingarten, AKA Yankev Nuchem Weingarten
Defendant
Mordechay Malka
Defendant - Appellant
Mayer Rosner
Represented By
Barry D. Leiwant
Federal Defenders of New York, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/16/2025 5:25 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
1 1 NOTICE OF CRIMINAL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Mayer Rosner, FILED. [3028828] [21-198] [Entered: 02/03/2021 11:32 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Criminal_Docketing_Notice
Att: 2 31 pgs Case FILED
2 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/29/2021, RECEIVED.[3028830] [21-198] [Entered: 02/03/2021 11:36 AM]
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3030633] [21-198] [Entered: 02/05/2021 11:06 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 32 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED