New York Southern District Court
Case #: 7:19-cr-00497
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2019
Terminated:Aug 02, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 07, 2022 4:40 PM EST
Defendant
Aron Rosner (3)
Represented By
Ilana Haramati
Meister Seelig & Fein LLP
contact info
Henry Edward Mazurek
Meister Seelig & Fein, LLP
contact info
Priya K. Pasricha
Meister Seelig & Fein LLP
contact info
Evan Loren Lipton
Law Office Of Evan L. Lipton
contact info
Defendant
Shmiel Weingarten (6)
Represented By
Michael Kennedy Burke
Hodges Walsh & Burke LLP
contact info
Daniel Adam Hochheiser
Law Offices Of Daniel A. Hochheiser
contact info
Defendant
Yakov Weingarten (8)
Represented By
Francis Lee O'Reilly
Law Office Of Francis L. Oreilly
contact info
Justin C. Pugh
Justin C. Pugh & Associates
contact info
Defendant
Yoil Weingarten (7)
Represented By
Sean Michael Maher
The Law Offices Of Sean M. Maher, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jamie Ellen Bagliebter
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny (st Andw'S)
contact info
James Alan Ligtenberg
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny (st Andw'S)
contact info
Samuel S Adelsberg
United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Nachman Helbrans (1)
Terminated: 10/26/2022
Represented By
Peter Joel Schaffer
Peter J. Schaeffer, Attorney At Law
contact info
Lawrence Murray Herrmann
contact info
Bruce D. Koffsky
Koffsky & Felsen, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Matityau Moshe Malka (5)
Terminated: 10/18/2022
Represented By
Joseph A. Vita
Joseph A. Vita
contact info
Howard Evan Tanner
Howard Tanner
contact info
Defendant
Jacob Rosner (4)
Terminated: 09/23/2022
Represented By
Melissa Jane Erwin
Carter Ledyard & Milburn
contact info
Sophia Sorella Sofferman
Fasulo Braverman & Di Maggio LLP
contact info
Samuel Michael Braverman
Fasulo Braverman & Di Maggio, LLP
contact info
Alan S. Lewis
Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mayer Rosner (2)
Terminated: 10/26/2022
Represented By
Mark B Gombiner
Federal Defenders Of New York Inc. (nyc)
contact info
Jason Immanuel Ser
Meister Seelig & Fein
contact info
Martin Samuel Cohen
Federal Defenders Of New York Inc. (nyc)
contact info
Susanne Brody
Federal Defenders Of New York Inc. (white Plains)
contact info
Defendant
Mordechay Malka (9)
Terminated: 10/09/2022
Represented By
Diane Margaret Fischer
Law Office Of Diane Fischer
contact info
Susan C. Wolfe
Susan C. Wolfe, Esq.
contact info
Ezra Spilke
Law Offices Of Ezra Spilke, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:00 PM EDT
Monday, December 24, 2018
Arrest of Aron Rosner. (ap) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (ap) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs COMPLAINT as to Aron Rosner (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith) (ap) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith: Initial Appearance as to Aron Rosner held on 12/24/2018. Appearances entered by AUSA Samuel Adelsberg and Jamie Baglieber for the Government, Attorney Evan Lipton on behalf of the defendant. Detention on consent w/o prejudice. AUSA Samuel Adelsberg and Jamie Bagliebter present for the Government. Defendant waives public reading of the complaint. Defendant is ordered detained on consent without prejudice to making a future bail application. Preliminary hearing 1/23/19 on Defendant's consent. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
4 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL: Evan Loren Lipton appearing for Aron Rosner. (ap) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Aron Rosner. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 12/24/2018) (See ORDER set forth) (ap) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 27, 2018
Arrest of Mayer Rosner. (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Nachman Helbrans. (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Jacob Rosner. (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
1 1 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to Mayer Rosner (1), Jacob Rosner (2), Nachman Helbrans (3). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison) (ap) Modified on 1/2/2019 (ap). [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 28, 2018
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison: Initial Appearance as to Mayer Rosner held on 12/28/2018. Appearances entered by AUSA Samuel Adelsberg and Jamie Bagliebter for the Government, Attorney Susanne Brody on beh+alf of the defendant. Detention: Risk of Flight. See Transcript. Preliminary hearing 1/11/19. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison: Initial Appearance as to Jacob Rosner held on 12/28/2018. Appearances entered by AUSA Samuel Adelsberg and Jamie Bagliebter for the Government, Attorney Samuel Braverman on behalf of the defendant. Detention on consent w/o prejudice. Preliminary hearing 1/11/19. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison: Initial Appearance as to Nachman Helbrans held on 12/28/2018. Appearances entered by AUSA Samuel Adelsberg and Jamie Bagliebter for the Government, Attorney Brice Koffsky on behalf of the defendant. Detention on consent w/o prejudice. Yiddish is first language but prefers to proceed in English. Preliminary hearing 1/11/19. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Mayer Rosner. APPROVED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison) (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jacob Rosner. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison) (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Nachman Helbrans. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison) (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 10, 2019
8 8 ENDORSED LETTER as to Mayer Rosner, Jacob Rosner, Nachman Helbrans addressed to Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith, from Samuel Adelsberg dated 1/8/2019 re: The Government writes to request a continuance to January 23, 2019. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 1/8/2019) (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 14, 2019
6 6 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Henry Edward Mazurek appearing for Aron Rosner. Appearance Type: Retained. (Mazurek, Henry) Modified on 1/15/2019 (ka).[7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
7 7 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MOTION for Bond Pending Trial . Document filed by Aron Rosner. (Mazurek, Henry) Modified on 1/15/2019 (ka). [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 15, 2019
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Henry Edward Mazurek as to Aron Rosner: to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Memorandum in Support of Aron Rosner's Motion for Bail, Document No. 7. This case is not ECF. (ka) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Mazurek, Henry as to Aron Rosner: to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Notice of Attorney Appearance, Document No. 6. This case is not ECF. (ka) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison: Detention Hearing as to Aron Rosner held on 1/15/2019. Appearances entered by AUSAs Samuel Adelsberg and Jamie Baglieber for the Government, Attorneys Evan Lipton and Henry Mazurek on behalf of the defendant. Consent to pre register. No cellphones or internet-connected devices in household. Govt. may enter residence to search for possible electronic devices upon reasonable suspicion. See bond for additional conditions. $10 Million PRB. 9 FRP. Secured by $6 Million property. Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY. Surrender Travel Documents (& no new applications) All members of household. Strict Pretrial Supervision. Def. to pay all of part of cost of location monitoring, as determined by pretrial services. Def. to be detained until all conditions are met. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
9 9 ENDORSED LETTER as to Jacob Rosner addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Sam Braverman, dated 1/15/2019, re: Counsel writes to request authorization to appoint associate Sophia Sofferman to assist me in this case at a compensation rate of $110 per hour, as per the presumptive hourly rate listed in the CJA Policy and Procedural Manual for associates that are full time employees of the firm. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Added attorney Sophia Sorella Sofferman for Jacob Rosner) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 1/16/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
9 9 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Aron Rosner. Time excluded from 1/23/2019 until 2/20/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 1/23/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
10 10 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Aron Rosner re:9 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Nachman Helbrans. Time excluded from 1/23/2019 until 2/20/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 1/23/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
11 11 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Nachman Helbrans re:10 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Jacob Rosner. Time excluded from 1/23/2019 until 2/20/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 1/23/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
13 13 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Jacob Rosner re:12 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Mayer Rosner. Time excluded from 1/23/2019 until 2/20/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 1/23/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
15 15 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Mayer Rosner re:14 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
11 11 ENDORSED LETTER as to Aron Rosner addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Attorney Evan L. Lipton, Henry E. Mazurek dated January 25, 2019 re: Accordingly, we propose the following modifications: (1) The caretakers for the Rosner children shall be permitted to possess their personal cellular telephones working in the Rosner residence, provided that: (a) counsel for Mr, Rosner shall inform the government and Pretrial Services of the identity of the caretakers; and (b) counsel for Mr. Rosner shall inform each caretaker that their phone must be password protected and may not be used by anyone else inside the Rosner residence. Counsel shall inform the government and Pretrial Services that they have advised the caretakers of this condition. (2) Hendy Rosner shall be permitted to possess a cellular telephone inside the residence, provided that: (a) the cellular telephone does not have internet capabilities; (b) Mrs. Rosner consents to inspection of her phone;, including its contents, by Pretrial Services; and (c) Aron Rosner is not permitted to use or access Mrs. Rosner's phone. ENDORSEMENT: Proposed modifications approved on consent. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 1/25/2019)(bw) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
12 12 Personal Recognizance Bond Bond Entered as to Aron Rosner in amount of $10,000,000.00; 9 FRP; Secured $6,000,000.00 Property; Surrender all travel documents with no new application. The bond is to be secured by 4 separate properties with equity in the amount of at least 6 Million. The defendant is placed on home detention enforced by OPS monitoring at Rosner's Brooklyn residence. Mr. Roser will be responsible to pay the cost. The defendant is permitted access to one telephone that will be approved by Pretrial Services to make and receive calls to and from phone numbers agreed to by counsel for Rosner and the Gov't. (consent to Pen Register). The defendant will not directly or indirectly associate or have contact,outside the presence of his counsel with his co-defendants, alleged co-conspirators, or any individual currently or formerly employed by or associated with Lev Tahor however, this does not limit the defense attorneys and their investigators from conducting appropriate defense investigation. SEE ADDITIONAL conditions. (ap) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
13 13 2ND ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Aron Rosner. Time excluded from 2/20/2019 until 3/20/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 2/20/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
14 14 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Aron Rosner re:13 2nd Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
16 16 2ND ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Mayer Rosner. Time excluded from 2/20/2019 until 3/20/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 2/20/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Mayer Rosner re:16 2nd Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
18 18 2ND ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Jacob Rosner. Time excluded from 2/20/2019 until 3/20/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 2/20/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
19 19 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Jacob Rosner re:18 2nd Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs 2ND ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Nachman Helbrans. Time excluded from 2/20/2019 until 3/20/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 2/20/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
21 21 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Nachman Helbrans re:20 2nd Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
15 15 3rd ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Aron Rosner. Time excluded from 3/20/2019 until 4/17/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 3/20/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
16 16 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Aron Rosner re:15 3rd Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
22 22 3rd ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Nachman Helbrans. Time excluded from 3/20/2019 until 4/17/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 3/20/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
23 23 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Nachman Helbrans re:22 3rd Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
24 24 3rd ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Jacob Rosner. Time excluded from 3/20/2019 until 4/17/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 3/20/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
25 25 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Jacob Rosner re:24 3rd Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
26 26 3rd ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Mayer Rosner. Time excluded from 3/20/2019 until 4/17/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 3/20/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
27 27 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Mayer Rosner re:26 3rd Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
Set/Reset Hearings as to Matityau Moshe Malka: Preliminary Hearing set for 4/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith. (ap) [7:19-mj-03011-UA]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith: Bond Hearing as to Jacob Rosner held on 3/26/2019. AUSA Jamie Bagliebter and Samuel Adelsberg appearing for the Government. Defendant Jacob Rosner present with attorney Samuel Braverman (CJA). Steven Zager present as Yiddish interpreter. Pre-trial services present. Defendant's application for bail is denied. Defendant's detention is continued. Adjourned. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs COMPLAINT as to Matityau Moshe Malka (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith) (ap) [7:19-mj-03011-UA]
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith: Initial Appearance as to Matityau Moshe Malka held on 3/26/2019. Bail Disposition: Detention on consent w/o prejudice. AUSA Jamie Bagliebter appearing for the Government. Joseph Vlta (CJA) appointed as counsel for Defendant. Steven Zager present as Yiddish interpreter. Defendant waives public reading of the complaint. Defendant is ordered detained on consent without prejudice to making a future bail application. Preliminary hearing scheduled for April 9, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Smith. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap) [7:19-mj-03011-UA]
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Matityau Moshe Malka. Appointed Joseph Vita, CJA. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith) (ap) [7:19-mj-03011-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
4 4 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith from United States dated April 5, 2019 re: Adjournment . Document filed by USA as to Matityau Moshe Malka. (Bagliebter, Jamie) Modified on 4/8/2019 (ka). [7:19-mj-03011-UA]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Bagliebter, Jamie as to Matityau Moshe Malka: to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Letter Motion, Document No. 4. This case is not ECF. (ka) [7:19-mj-03011-UA]
Related: [-]
5 5 ENDORSED LETTER as to Matityau Moshe Malka addressed to Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith from Jamie Bagliebter, dated 4/5/2019, re: The Government writes to request an order of continuance in the above-referenced case, from April 9, 2019 (the fourteenth day following the initial appearance), to April 17, 2019 (the twenty-second day following the initial appearance). The request is made with the request of defense counsel. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 4/8/2019) (lnl) [7:19-mj-03011-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
6 6 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Matityau Moshe Malka. Time excluded from 4/17/2019 until 5/15/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 4/17/2019) (ap) [7:19-mj-03011-UA]
Related: [-]
17 17 4TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Aron Rosner. Time excluded from 4/17/2019 until 5/15/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 4/17/2019) (ap) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
18 18 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Aron Rosner re:17 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
28 28 4TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Mayer Rosner. Time excluded from 4/17/2019 until 05/15/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 4/17/2019) (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
29 29 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Mayer Rosner re:28 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
30 30 4TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Jacob Rosner. Time excluded from 4/17/2019 until 5/15/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 4/17/2019) (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
31 31 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Jacob Rosner re:30 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
32 32 4TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Nachman Helbrans. Time excluded from 4/17/2019 until 5/15/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 4/17/2019) (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
33 33 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Nachman Helbrans re:32 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
19 19 ENDORSED LETTER as to Aron Rosner addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from defense counsel Evan Lipton dated 5/14/19 re: requesting bail modification of conditions of pretrial release...ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 5/14/19)(jbo) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
7 7 2nd ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Matityau Moshe Malka. Time excluded from 5/15/2019 until 6/12/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 5/15/2019) (lnl) [7:19-mj-03011-UA]
Related: [-]
8 8 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Matityau Moshe Malka re:7 2nd Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:19-mj-03011-UA]
Related: [-]
20 20 5th ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Aron Rosner. Time excluded from 5/15/2019 until 6/12/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 5/15/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
21 21 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Aron Rosner re:20 5th Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
34 34 5th ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Mayer Rosner. Time excluded from 5/15/2019 until 6/12/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 5/15/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
35 35 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Mayer Rosner re:34 5th Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
36 36 5th ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Jacob Rosner. Time excluded from 5/15/2019 until 6/12/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 5/15/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
37 37 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Jacob Rosner re:36 5th Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
38 38 5th ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Nachman Helbrans. Time excluded from 5/15/2019 until 6/12/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 5/15/2019) (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
39 39 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Nachman Helbrans re:38 5th Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2019
22 22 ENDORSED LETTER as to Aron Rosner addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison, from Evan L. Lipton and Henry E. Mazurck dated 5/23/2019 re: Defense counsel writes to request modification of conditions of pretrial release. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 5/23/2019) (ap) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
9 9 3RD ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Matityau Moshe Malka. Time excluded from 6/12/2019 until 7/10/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 6/12/2019) (ap) [7:19-mj-03011-UA]
Related: [-]
10 10 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Matityau Moshe Malka re:9 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:19-mj-03011-UA]
Related: [-]
23 23 6TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Aron Rosner. Time excluded from 6/12/2019 until 7/10/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 6/12/2019) (ap) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
24 24 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Aron Rosner re:23 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
40 40 6TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Mayer Rosner. Time excluded from 6/12/2019 until 7/10/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 6/12/2018) (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
41 41 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Mayer Rosner re:40 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
42 42 6TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Jacob Rosner. Time excluded from 6/12/2019 until 7/10/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 6/12/2019) (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
43 43 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Jacob Rosner re:42 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
44 44 6TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Nachman Helbrans. Time excluded from 6/12/2019 until 7/10/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 6/12/2019) (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
45 45 AFFIRMATION of Samuel Adelsberg in Support by USA as to Nachman Helbrans re:44 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2019
46 46 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jacob Rosner. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Hearing proceeding held on 03/26/2019 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Arends-Dieck, Christina) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
47 47 23 pgs TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jacob Rosner re: Hearing held on 03/26/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Arends-Dieck, (914) 390-4103, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2019. (Arends-Dieck, Christina) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
48 48 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Martin Samuel Cohen appearing for Mayer Rosner. Appearance Type: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment. (Cohen, Martin) Modified on 6/14/2019 (ka). [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Cohen, Martin as to Mayer Rosner: to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Notice of Attorney Appearance, Document No. 48. This case is not ECF. (ka) [7:18-mj-10939-UA]
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 07, 2019
25 25 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Aron Rosner. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Hearing proceeding held on 01/15/2019 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (O'Donnell, Angela) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
26 26 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Aron Rosner re: Hearing held on 01/15/2019 before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Angela O*Donnell, (914) 390-4025, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2019. (O'Donnell, Angela) [7:18-mj-10891-UA]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2019
Case Designated ECF as to Nachman Helbrans, Mayer Rosner, Aron Rosner, Jacob Rosner, Matityau Moshe Malka. (ap)
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (ap)
Related: [-]
49 49 7 pgs INDICTMENT FILED as to Nachman Helbrans (1) count(s) 1,2-4, Mayer Rosner (2) count(s) 1,2-3, Aron Rosner (3) count(s) 1,2-3, Jacob Rosner (4) count(s) 1,2-3, Matityau Moshe Malka (5) count(s) 1,4. (ap)
Related: [-]