Original Case: 7:19-cr-00497

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cr-00280
Typecriminal / interlocutory
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2021
Terminated:Jul 21, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Apr 01, 2021 8:15 PM EDT
Appellee USA
United States of America
Represented By
Won S. Shin
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New
contact info
James Ligtenberg
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New
contact info
Defendant
Mayer Rosner
Defendant
Aron Rosner, AKA Aaron Rosner
Defendant
Jacob Rosner, AKA Chaim Rosner
Defendant
Matityau Moshe Malka
Defendant
Shmiel Weingarten
Defendant
Yoil Weingarten, AKA Yoel Weingarten
Defendant
Yakov Weingarten, AKA Yaakov Weingarten, AKA Yankev Nuchem Weingarten
Defendant
Mordechay Malka
Defendant - Appellant
Nachman Helbrans
Represented By
Bruce Donald Koffsky
Koffsky & Felsen, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/29/2024 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, February 11, 2021
1 1 NOTICE OF CRIMINAL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Nachman Helbrans, FILED. [3035661] [21-280] [Entered: 02/12/2021 01:29 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Criminal_Docketing_Notice
Att: 2 34 pgs Case FILED
2 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/10/2021, RECEIVED.[3035668] [21-280] [Entered: 02/12/2021 01:33 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3035670] [21-280] [Entered: 02/12/2021 01:34 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 35 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED