Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Stephen P Friot
Referred: Mediator
Case #: 5:14-cv-00650
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2014
Re-opened:May 15, 2024
Terminated:Aug 05, 2024
Case in other court:Tenth Circuit, 20-06057 Tenth Circuit, 20-06100 Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals, 21-06019
Last checked: Thursday Jul 14, 2016 1:15 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Hetronic Germany GMBH
Represented By
David L Kearney
Hall Estill-Okc
contact info
Geren T Steiner
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Evan G E Vincent
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
John M Krattiger
Gable & Gotwals-Okc
contact info
Anton J Rupert
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
David M Sullivan
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Counter Claimant
Hydronic-Steuersysteme-GMBH
Represented By
David L Kearney
Hall Estill-Okc
contact info
Geren T Steiner
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Evan G E Vincent
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
John M Krattiger
Gable & Gotwals-Okc
contact info
Anton J Rupert
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
David M Sullivan
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Counter Defendant
Hetronic International Inc
Represented By
John N Hermes
Mcafee & Taft
contact info
Debbie L Berman
Jenner & Block Llp-Chicago
contact info
Samuel R Fulkerson
Mcafee & Taft-Okc
contact info
Philip R Bruce
Mcafee & Taft-Okc
contact info
Michael H Margolis
Jenner & Block Llp-Chicago
contact info
Wade A Thomson
Jenner & Block Llp-Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Hetronic Germany GMBH
Represented By
David L Kearney
Hall Estill-Okc
contact info
Geren T Steiner
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Evan G E Vincent
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
John M Krattiger
Gable & Gotwals-Okc
contact info
Anton J Rupert
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Meredith W Wolfe
Meredith W Wolfe
contact info
David M Sullivan
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Defendant
Hydronic-Steuersysteme-GMBH
Represented By
David L Kearney
Hall Estill-Okc
contact info
Geren T Steiner
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Evan G E Vincent
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
John M Krattiger
Gable & Gotwals-Okc
contact info
Anton J Rupert
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Meredith W Wolfe
Meredith W Wolfe
contact info
David M Sullivan
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Defendant
ABI Holding Gmbh
Represented By
Geren T Steiner
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Evan G E Vincent
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Anton J Rupert
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Meredith W Wolfe
Meredith W Wolfe
contact info
David M Sullivan
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Defendant
Abitron Austria GmbH
Represented By
Geren T Steiner
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Evan G E Vincent
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Anton J Rupert
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Meredith W Wolfe
Meredith W Wolfe
contact info
David M Sullivan
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Defendant
Abitron Germany GmbH
Represented By
Geren T Steiner
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Evan G E Vincent
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Anton J Rupert
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Meredith W Wolfe
Meredith W Wolfe
contact info
David M Sullivan
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Defendant
Albert Fuchs
Represented By
Geren T Steiner
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Evan G E Vincent
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Anton J Rupert
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Meredith W Wolfe
Meredith W Wolfe
contact info
David M Sullivan
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Plaintiff
Hetronic International Inc
Represented By
John N Hermes
Mcafee & Taft
contact info
Debbie L Berman
Jenner & Block Llp-Chicago
contact info
Samuel R Fulkerson
Mcafee & Taft-Okc
contact info
Philip R Bruce
Mcafee & Taft-Okc
contact info
Michael H Margolis
Jenner & Block Llp-Chicago
contact info
Wade A Thomson
Jenner & Block Llp-Chicago
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, October 04, 2024
misc Docket Annotation Fri 10/04 9:38 AM
Docket Annotation : Pursuant to564 Enter Order, the parties' exhibits admitted into evidence at the April 20-21, 2022 evidentiary hearing have been withdrawn and retrieved by counsel. (llg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
564 564 1 pgs order Order Wed 10/02 3:49 PM
ENTER ORDER . The court DIRECTS that the parties' exhibits admitted into evidence at the April 20-21, 2022 evidentiary hearing regarding geographic scope of permanent injunction be WITHDRAWN. The parties are DIRECTED to make arrangements with the courtroom deputy, not later than October 8, 2024, for retrieval of the exhibits. Entered at the direction of Judge Stephen P. Friot on 10/2/2024. (llg)
Related: [-]