Original Case: 5:14-cv-00650

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-06019
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2021
Terminated:Oct 29, 2021
Last checked: Monday Nov 01, 2021 2:26 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellant
HETRONIC GERMANY GMBH
Represented By
Mack J. Morgan III
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Anton Joseph Rupert
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Geren Thomas Steiner
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
HYDRONIC-STEUERSYSTEME GMBH
Represented By
Mack J. Morgan III
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Anton Joseph Rupert
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Geren Thomas Steiner
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
ABI HOLDING GMBH
Represented By
Mack J. Morgan III
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Anton Joseph Rupert
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Geren Thomas Steiner
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
ABITRON GERMANY GMBH
Represented By
Mack J. Morgan III
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Anton Joseph Rupert
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Geren Thomas Steiner
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
ABITRON AUSTRIA GMBH
Represented By
Mack J. Morgan III
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Anton Joseph Rupert
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Geren Thomas Steiner
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
ALBERT FUCHS
Represented By
Mack J. Morgan III
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Anton Joseph Rupert
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Geren Thomas Steiner
Rupert, Steiner & Morgan
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
HETRONIC INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By
Samuel R. Fulkerson
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Wade A. Thomson
Jenner & Block
contact info
John N. Hermes
McAfee & Taft
contact info
Debbie L. Berman
Jenner & Block
contact info
Philip R. Bruce
McAfee & Taft
contact info
Matthew S. Hellman
Jenner & Block
contact info
Laura E. B. Hulce
Jenner & Block
contact info
Gianni P. Servodidio
Jenner & Block
contact info

GPO Oct 29 2021
[10868457] Affirmed. Terminated on the merits after submissions without oral hearing. Written, signed, unpublished; Judges Hartz, McHugh (authoring judge) and Carson. Mandate to issue. [21-6019]

Docket last updated: 11/01/2021 2:26 AM MDT
Friday, February 19, 2021
[10808941] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/19/2021 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 03/05/2021 for ABI Holding GmbH, Abitron Austria GmbH, Abitron Germany GmbH, Albert Fuchs, Hetronic Germany GmbH and Hydronic-Steuersysteme GmbH. Notice of appearance also due on 03/05/2021 for Hetronic International, Inc. 21-6019
Related: [-]
Att: 1 67 pgs Preliminary record
Att: 2 1 pgs Transmittal letter
Att: 3 3 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil