Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10316

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:21-ap-50102
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2021
Terminated:Aug 30, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Express
Represented By
American Express
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Bankruptcy Estates of BeavEx Holding Corporation, et al.
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, August 30, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Mon 08/30 1:25 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50102 Closed (SJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 27, 2021
12 12 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 08/27 5:00 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by George L. Miller (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 07/21 2:51 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 7/22/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
10 10 order Approve Settlement Fri 07/16 5:24 PM
Fourth Omnibus Order, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a), Approving Settlement Agreements Related [+] Order Signed on 7/16/2021. (LJJ)
Related: [-] 8
9 9 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Fri 07/16 10:07 AM
Certificate of No Objection -- Certificate of No Objection Regarding the Fourth Omnibus Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Approving Settlement Agreements -- Filed by George L. Miller. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 01, 2021
8 8 motion Approve Settlement - Motion Thu 07/01 4:23 PM
Omnibus Motion to Approve Settlement -- Fourth Omnibus Motion of the Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Approving Settlement Agreements -- Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 7/22/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/15/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Tue 05/11 4:12 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 05/11 11:46 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
5 5 misc Initial Disclosures Mon 04/12 1:08 PM
Initial Disclosures Filed by American Express. (Miller, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/12 1:06 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by American Express Mediation due date: 08/10/2021.(Miller, Kathleen)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 11, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/11 12:56 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant American Express. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/10/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 18, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/18 8:35 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50102 LSS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 00, amount $ 350.00. (BA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 02/17 6:43 PM
Adversary case 21-50102 Complaint by George L. Miller against American Express. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/18/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives