Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:19-bk-10316
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2019
Creditor Meeting:Aug 29, 2019
Claims Deadline:Oct 01, 2019
Converted:Jul 23, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
BeavEx Holding Corporation
2120 Powers Ferry Rd SE Ste 300
Atlanta, GA 30339-5020
Represented By
Matthew Barry Lunn
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Jordan E Sazant
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Joseph M. Barry
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Donald J. Bowman, Jr.
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Stretto
www.stretto.com 410 Exchange, Ste 100
Irvine, CA 92602
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Mark Minuti
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Lucian Borders Murley
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Tristan G Axelrod
Brown Rudnick LLP
contact info
Bennett Silverberg
Brown Rudnick LLP
contact info
Eugene J. Geekie, Jr.
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
Trustee
George L. Miller
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Jaclyn Weissgerber
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Richard L. Schepacarter
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/14/2021 12:42 PM EDT
Monday, February 18, 2019
court Case Assigned Mon 02/18 1:48 PM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case (BA)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Mon 02/18 4:10 PM
Attorney Carey Schreiber and Gregory A. Taylor for Eos Partners, L.P. and ECP Helios Partners IV, L.P., Stacy L. Newman and Gregory A. Taylor for Eos Partners, L.P. and ECP Helios Partners IV, L.P. added to case Filed by Eos Partners, L.P. and ECP Helios Partners IV, L.P.. (Taylor, Gregory)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Mon 02/18 5:40 PM
Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Weissgerber, Jaclyn)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 02/18 12:12 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by BeavEx Holding Corporation. (Barry, Joseph)
Related: [-]
2 2 17 pgs first Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion Mon 02/18 12:47 PM
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion // Declaration of Donald Van der Wiel in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First Day Motions Filed By BeavEx Holding Corporation (Bowman, Donald)
Related: [-]
3 3 10 pgs motion Joint Administration - Motion Mon 02/18 12:50 PM
Motion for Joint Administration // Debtors' Motion for an Order, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1015 and Local Rule 1015-1, Authorizing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Filed By BeavEx Holding Corporation (Bowman, Donald)
Related: [-]
4 4 32 pgs motion Application to Appoint Claims/Noticing Agent Mon 02/18 12:51 PM
Application to Appoint Claims/Noticing Agent STRETTO Filed By BeavEx Holding Corporation (Bowman, Donald)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts Mon 02/18 12:57 PM
Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts // Debtors' Motion for Interim and Final Orders, Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 345, 363 and 503(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 2015 and Local Rule 2015-2 (I) Authorizing and Approving (A) Continued Use of Cash Management System and (B) Use of Prepetition Bank Accounts and Business Forms; (II) Authorizing the Banks Participating in the Cash Management System to Honor Certain Transfers and Charge Certain Amounts; (III) Waiving the Requirements of Section 345(b) on an Interim Basis; (IV) Granting Administrative Expense Status to Postpetition Intercompany Claims; and (V) Granting Related Relief Filed By BeavEx Holding Corporation (Bowman, Donald)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Motion to Pay Employee Wages Mon 02/18 1:00 PM
Motion to Pay Employee Wages // Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Payment of (I) Certain Prepetition Employee Obligations, Including Wages, Salaries, and Other Compensation; (II) Certain Employee Benefits and Other Associated Obligations; and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed By BeavEx Holding Corporation (Bowman, Donald)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Mon 02/18 1:02 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions // Debtors' Motion for Interim and Final Orders, Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363, 1107(a) and 1108 of the Bankruptcy Code, (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Contract Couriers and Third-Party Service Providers, (II) Authorizing Banks to Honor and Process Check and Electronic Transfer Requests Related Thereto, and (III) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed By BeavEx Holding Corporation (Bowman, Donald)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Motion to Continue Customer Programs Mon 02/18 1:04 PM
Motion to Continue Customer Programs // Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Debtors to Honor and Continue Certain Customer Programs and Customer Obligations in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed By BeavEx Holding Corporation (Bowman, Donald)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Motion to Pay Critical Trade Vendor Claims Mon 02/18 1:06 PM
Motion to Pay Critical Trade Vendor Claims // Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Critical Vendors and Administrative Claimholders Filed By BeavEx Holding Corporation (Bowman, Donald)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Mon 02/18 1:08 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions // Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims for Shipper and Common Carrier Obligations Filed By BeavEx Holding Corporation (Bowman, Donald)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Motion to Pay Sales and Use Taxes Mon 02/18 1:10 PM
Motion to Pay Sales and Use Taxes // Debtors' Motion for Interim and Final Orders, Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363(b), 507(a)(8), 541, 1107(a), and 1108 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing (I) the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes and Fees and Related Obligations and (II) Banks to Honor and Process Check and Electronic Transfer Requests Related Thereto Filed By BeavEx Holding Corporation (Bowman, Donald)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Mon 02/18 1:12 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions // Debtors' Motion for Interim and Final Orders, Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363, and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code, (I) Authorizing (A) Payment of Prepetition Obligations Incurred in the Ordinary Course of Business in Connection with Insurance Programs, Including Payment of Policy Premiums and (B) Continuation of Insurance Premium Finance Agreement, and (II) Authorizing Banks to Honor and Process Check and Electronic Transfer Requests Related Thereto Filed By BeavEx Holding Corporation (Bowman, Donald)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service Mon 02/18 1:15 PM
Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service // Debtors' Motion for Interim and Final Orders, Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 366 of the Bankruptcy Code, (I) Prohibiting Utility Companies from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Services; (II) Deeming Utility Companies Adequately Assured of Future Payment; (III) Establishing Procedures for Determining Additional Adequate Assurance of Payment; and (IV) Granting Related Relief, Including Setting a Final Hearing Related Thereto Filed By BeavEx Holding Corporation (Bowman, Donald)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Approve Debtor In Possession Financing - Motion Mon 02/18 1:24 PM
Motion to Approve Debtor In Possession Financing Filed By BeavEx Holding Corporation (Bowman, Donald)
Related: [-]
15 15 court Standing Order/Transcripts Mon 02/18 1:54 PM
The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Reliable Companies . Telephone number 302-654-8080 .. Related [+]
Related: [-] liable
16 16 motion Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) - Motion (FEE) Mon 02/18 2:12 PM
Motion For Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)(FEE) // Debtors' Motion, Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363 and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code for Entry of: (I) an Order (A) Approving and Authorizing Bidding Procedures in Connection with the Sale of Substantially All the Debtors' Assets, (B) Approving and Authorizing the Bid Protections, (C) Scheduling the Related Auction and Hearing to Consider Approval of the Sale, (D) Approving Procedures Related to the Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, (E) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof and (F) Granting Related Relief; and (II) an Order (A) Authorizing the Sale of Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Other Interests, (B) Authorizing and Approving the Debtors' Performance Under the Asset Purchase Agreement, (C) Approving the Assumption and Assignment of Certain of the Debtors' Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Related Thereto and (D) Granting Related Relief Fee Amount $181 Filed by BeavEx Holding Corporation. (Bowman, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
17 17 crditcrd none Mon 02/18 2:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) 19-10316 LSS) [motion,msell] ( 181.00). Receipt Number 9202642, amount $ 181.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
18 18 crditcrd none Mon 02/18 2:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-10316 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9202644, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Appearance - Notice Mon 02/18 4:08 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Eos Partners, L.P. and ECP Helios Partners IV, L.P.. (Taylor, Gregory)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Mon 02/18 4:12 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Carey D. Schreiber, Esq. . Receipt Number 2572706, Filed by Eos Partners, L.P. and ECP Helios Partners IV, L.P.. (Taylor, Gregory)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc List of Creditors Mon 02/18 5:42 PM
List of Creditors // Declaration Concerning List of Creditors and Creditor Matrix Filed by BeavEx Holding Corporation. (Bowman, Donald)
Related: [-]