Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10316

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:21-ap-50103
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2021
Terminated:Sep 20, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Amerigas
Represented By
Amerigas
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Bankruptcy Estates of BeavEx Holding Corporation, et al.
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
7 7 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 10/05 7:08 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by George L. Miller (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, September 20, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Mon 09/20 11:39 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50103 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/15 11:04 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2021 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 09/14 12:39 PM
Fifth Omnibus Order, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a), Approving Settlement Agreements Signed on 9/14/2021 (LJJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 09/13 4:18 PM
Certificate of No Objection -- Certificate of No Objection Regarding the Fifth Omnibus Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Approving Settlement Agreements -- Filed by George L. Miller. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 26, 2021
3 3 motion Approve Settlement - Motion Thu 08/26 2:34 PM
Motion to Approve Settlement -- Fifth Omnibus Motion of the Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Approving Settlement Agreements -- Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2021 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 9/10/2021. (Klauder, David) Modified on 8/27/2021 (SH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/18 8:35 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50103 LSS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 00, amount $ 350.00. (BA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 02/17 7:06 PM
Adversary case 21-50103 Complaint by George L. Miller against Amerigas. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/18/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives