Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10316

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:21-ap-50104
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2021
Terminated:Jul 08, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Associated Packaging Inc.
Represented By
Associated Packaging Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Bankruptcy Estates of BeavEx Holding Corporation, et al.
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, July 08, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/08 9:45 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50104 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
11 11 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 07/07 7:06 PM
Notice of Dismissal -- Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal -- Filed by George L. Miller (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
court Close Adversary Case Wed 07/07 8:53 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50104 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
utility Reopen AP Case Wed 07/07 9:45 AM
Adversary Case Reopened. (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
10 10 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 07/06 8:37 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by George L. Miller (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Tue 05/11 4:12 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Approving Settlement Tue 05/11 3:22 PM
Second Omnibus Order, Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 9019(a), Approving Settlement Agreements Related [+] Order Signed on 5/11/2021. (LJJ)
Related: [-] 5
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 05/11 11:46 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
6 6 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Mon 05/10 2:05 PM
Certificate of No Objection -- Certificate of No Objection Regarding the Second Omnibus Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Approving Settlement Agreements -- Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, April 22, 2021
5 5 motion Approve Settlement - Motion Thu 04/22 9:16 PM
Omnibus Motion to Approve Settlement -- Second Omnibus Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Approving Settlement Agreements -- Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/6/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Att: 6 Service List
Att: 7 Notice
Friday, April 09, 2021
4 4 motion Stipulation Fri 04/09 7:25 PM
Stipulation Between George L. Miller and Associated Packaging, Inc. for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint . Filed by George L. Miller. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/11 12:57 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Associated Packaging Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/10/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 18, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/18 8:35 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50104 LSS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 00, amount $ 350.00. (BA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 02/17 7:09 PM
Adversary case 21-50104 Complaint by George L. Miller against Associated Packaging Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/18/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives