Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10316

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:21-ap-50109
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2021
Terminated:Dec 01, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Earthlink Business
Represented By
Earthlink Business
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Bankruptcy Estates of BeavEx Holding Corporation, et al.
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, December 01, 2022
18 18 notice Dismissal - Notice Thu 12/01 10:08 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by George L. Miller (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/01 12:46 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50109 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
17 17 notice Withdrawal - Notice Thu 09/22 5:06 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of D.I. #13 and D.I. #14 Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller (Klauder, David)
Related: [-] 13 ,14
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
16 16 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Tue 09/06 11:56 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 9/8/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 31, 2022
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 08/01 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 07/31/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Friday, July 29, 2022
14 14 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 07/29 11:23 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Earthlink Business Related [+] Signed on 7/29/2022. (LCN)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, July 28, 2022
13 13 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Thu 07/28 3:32 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, July 11, 2022
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 07/11 5:48 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2022 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 05/09 5:57 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/12/2022 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Tue 02/15 10:29 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 2/17/2022 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/15 3:11 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2021 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 11/15 2:53 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/15 11:04 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2021 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 07/21 2:51 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 7/22/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Tue 05/11 4:12 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 05/11 11:46 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/11 1:02 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Earthlink Business. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/10/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 18, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/18 8:36 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50109 LSS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 00, amount $ 350.00. (BA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 02/17 7:27 PM
Adversary case 21-50109 Complaint by George L. Miller against Earthlink Business. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/18/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives