Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10316

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:21-ap-50117
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2021
Terminated:Feb 03, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
FV Courier
Represented By
FV Courier
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Bankruptcy Estates of BeavEx Holding Corporation, et al.
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, February 03, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/03 1:01 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50117 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 21, 2023
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/22 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/21/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20
Thursday, January 19, 2023
20 20 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Thu 01/19 11:00 AM
Default Judgment Against Defendant FV Courier d/b/a Frank Villa. Related [+] Signed on 1/19/2023. (LCN)
Related: [-] 19
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
19 19 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Wed 01/18 5:00 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by George L. Miller. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of David M. Klauder
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 06, 2023
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/07 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/06/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
17 17 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 01/04 1:56 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant FV Courier d/b/a Frank Villa Related [+] Signed on 1/4/2023. (LCN)
Related: [-] 16
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
16 16 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Tue 01/03 12:06 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by George L. Miller. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
15 15 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/07 2:43 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2022 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
14 14 cmp Alias Summons Thu 09/22 1:45 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant FV Courier. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2022 at 10:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David) Modified text on 9/23/2022 (LCN)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
13 13 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Tue 09/06 11:56 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 9/8/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 07/11 5:48 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2022 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 05/09 5:57 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/12/2022 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Tue 02/15 10:29 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 2/17/2022 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/15 3:11 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2021 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 11/15 2:53 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/15 11:04 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2021 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 07/21 2:51 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 7/22/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Tue 05/11 4:12 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 05/11 11:46 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/11 1:12 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant FV Courier. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/10/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 18, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/18 8:36 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50117 LSS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 00, amount $ 350.00. (BA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 02/17 7:56 PM
Adversary case 21-50117 Complaint by George L. Miller against FV Courier. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/18/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives