Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10316

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:21-ap-50119
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2021
Terminated:Dec 16, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
JDA Software Inc.
Represented By
JDA Software Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Bankruptcy Estates of BeavEx Holding Corporation, et al.
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, December 16, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/16 8:12 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50119 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/15 3:11 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2021 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order Wed 12/15 12:37 PM
Sixth Omnibus Order, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) Approving Settlement Agreements. Order Signed on 12/15/2021 (LJJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
10 10 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 12/13 12:42 PM
Certificate of No Objection -- Certificate of No Objection Regarding the Sixth Omnibus Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Approving Settlement Agreements -- Filed by George L. Miller. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
9 9 motion Approve Settlement - Motion Wed 11/24 11:50 AM
Motion to Approve Settlement -- Sixth Omnibus Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Approving Settlement Agreements -- Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2021 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/9/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 11/15 2:53 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 09/15 11:04 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2021 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 07/21 2:51 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 7/22/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Tue 05/11 4:12 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 05/11 11:46 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/11 1:14 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant JDA Software Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/10/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 18, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/18 8:36 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50119 LSS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 00, amount $ 350.00. (BA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 02/17 8:08 PM
Adversary case 21-50119 Complaint by George L. Miller against JDA Software Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/18/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives