Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10316

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:21-ap-50129
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2021
Terminated:Dec 07, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Six New York Apartments
Represented By
Six New York Apartments
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Bankruptcy Estates of BeavEx Holding Corporation, et al.
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, December 07, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/07 12:34 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50129 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
4 4 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 12/06 2:26 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by George L. Miller (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/14 12:57 PM
Amended Complaint to Add Party Filed by George L. Miller Related [+] AP Summons Served due date: 12/13/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, February 18, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/18 8:36 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50129 LSS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 00, amount $ 350.00. (BA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 02/17 8:45 PM
Adversary case 21-50129 Complaint by George L. Miller against Six New York Apartments. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/18/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives