Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10316

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:21-ap-50135
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2021
Terminated:Jul 08, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Verizon Communications Inc.
Represented By
Verizon Communications Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Bankruptcy Estates of BeavEx Holding Corporation, et al.
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, July 08, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/08 8:40 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50135 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
12 12 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 07/07 6:45 PM
Notice of Dismissal -- Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal -- Filed by George L. Miller (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
11 11 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 07/06 8:46 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by George L. Miller (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
10 10 order Approve Settlement Tue 06/22 12:07 PM
Third Omnibus Order, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a), Approving Settlement Agreements Related [+] Order Signed on 6/22/2021. (CMB)
Related: [-] 7
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Tue 06/22 12:03 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 6/24/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
8 8 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Mon 06/21 12:15 PM
Certificate of No Objection -- Third Omnibus Motion of the Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Approving Settlement Agreements -- Related [+] Filed by George L. Miller. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-] 7
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, June 03, 2021
7 7 motion Approve Settlement - Motion Thu 06/03 4:23 PM
Omnibus Motion to Approve Settlement -- Third Omnibus Motion of the Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Approving Settlement Agreements -- Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 6/24/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/17/2021. (Klauder, David) Modified on 6/4/2021 to add sd code (LH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Tue 05/11 4:12 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 05/11 11:46 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
4 4 motion Stipulation Mon 04/12 3:34 PM
Stipulation Between George L. Miller and Verizon Communications Inc. for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint . Filed by George L. Miller. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/11 2:13 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Verizon Communications Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/10/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 18, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/18 8:36 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50135 LSS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 00, amount $ 350.00. (BA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 02/17 9:24 PM
Adversary case 21-50135 Complaint by George L. Miller against Verizon Communications Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/18/2021. (Klauder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives