Miller v. XTRA Lease LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10316
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10316
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-50137 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
XTRA Lease LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Bankruptcy Estates of BeavEx Holding Corporation, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 05, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Dismissal Filed by George L. Miller (Klauder, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 20, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 09/20 11:42 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-50137 Closed (LCN) |
||
Wednesday, September 15, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2021 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David) |
|
Tuesday, September 14, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Fifth Omnibus Order, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a), Approving Settlement Agreements Signed on 9/14/2021 (LJJ) |
|
Monday, September 13, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of No Objection -- Certificate of No Objection Regarding the Fifth Omnibus Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Approving Settlement Agreements -- Filed by George L. Miller. (Klauder, David) |
|
Thursday, August 26, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Fifth Omnibus Motion of the Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Approving Settlement Agreements Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2021 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 9/10/2021. (Klauder, David) Modified on 8/27/2021 to Add SD Code (LB) |
|
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 7/22/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 26, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Stipulation Between George L. Miller and XTRA Lease LLC for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint . Filed by George L. Miller. (Klauder, David) |
|
Tuesday, May 11, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by George L. Miller. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Klauder, David) |
|
Friday, April 09, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Stipulation Between George L. Miller and XTRA Lease, LLC for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint . Filed by George L. Miller. (Klauder, David) |
|
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant XTRA Lease LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/10/2021. (Klauder, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, February 18, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 02/18 8:36 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-50137 LSS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 00, amount $ 350.00. (BA) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-50137 Complaint by George L. Miller against XTRA Lease LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 5/18/2021. (Klauder, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |