Michael Muncy et al v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01498 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Feb 18, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 13, 2021 |
Case in other court: | California Eastern, 1:21-cv-00147 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 17, 2021 1:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Racheal Mattinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Muncy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, July 19, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 07/20 8:59 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS THIS CASE WITH PREJUDICE PER FRCP RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Stipulation12 is approved. The entire action, including all claims and counterclaims stated herein against all parties, is hereby ORDERED to be dismissed with prejudice, each side to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 07/13 2:10 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Nassihi, Amir) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 16, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 03/16 4:52 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Change of Address10 , Notice of Change of Address9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
10 | 10
attorney
Change of Address
Tue 03/16 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Change of address by Amir M. Nassihi attorney for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Changing attorneys address to 555 Mission Street, Suite 2300, San Francisco, CA 94105. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Nassihi, Amir) |
|
9 | 9
attorney
Change of Address
Tue 03/16 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Change of address by Nalani Lin Crisologo attorney for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Changing attorneys address to 555 Mission Street, Suite 2300, San Francisco, CA 94105. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Crisologo, Nalani) |
|
Tuesday, February 23, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 02/23 12:19 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Tue 02/23 12:16 PM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (esa) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Fri 02/19 11:23 AM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2021 | ||
5 | 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-58). CASE TRANSFERRED to Central District of California. MDL No. 2814.(Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/19/2021.] | |
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward:3 Civil New Case Documents for DAD, sent to James Stephen Kostas at 1672 West Avenue J Lancaster, CA 93534. (Maldonado, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/19/2021.] | ||
Monday, February 08, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re2 Notice of Related Case(s),1 Notice of Removal,. (Crisologo, Nalani) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/19/2021.] | |
Friday, February 05, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Maldonado, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/19/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 JLT Worksheet, | ||
Att: 3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, | ||
Att: 4 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 5 VDRP | ||
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Civil New Case Documents for DAD, served on James Stephen Kostas. (Maldonado, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/19/2021.] | ||
Thursday, February 04, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:18-ml-02814-AB-PVC by Ford Motor Company.(Crisologo, Nalani) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/19/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court of California, case number BCV-20-103018 by Ford Motor Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9400003)(Crisologo, Nalani) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/19/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Nalani Crisologo, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Ford's Answer, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Notice of Interested Entities |