California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:M Elaine Hammond
Case #: 5:21-bk-50275
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2021
Creditor Meeting:Apr 06, 2021
Claims Deadline:May 10, 2021
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Jul 07, 2022

Debtor
Blade Global Corporation
67 E Evelyn Ave Ste 7
Mountain View, CA 94041-1529
Represented By
Robert G. Harris
Law Offices Of Binder And Malter
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Not Assigned - SJ
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113


Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Monday, July 15, 2024
430 430 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Mon 07/15 11:32 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 9/30/2024 Filed by Debtor Blade Global Corporation (Harris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
429 429 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Mon 07/15 11:27 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 06/30/2024 Filed by Debtor Blade Global Corporation (Harris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
428 428 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Mon 07/15 10:28 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Blade Global Corporation (Harris, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, July 12, 2024
427 427 order Final Decree Fri 07/12 12:52 PM
Final Decree and Order Closing Case Related [+] (rdr)
Related: [-] 424
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 07/12 12:53 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (rdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
426 426 misc Request For Entry of Default Thu 07/11 2:33 PM
Request for Entry of Default Re: Entry of Order on Motion for Entry of Final Decree and Order Closing Bankruptcy Case Related [+]. Filed by Debtor Blade Global Corporation (Harris, Robert)
Related: [-] 424 Application for Entry of Final Decree
Att: 1 Declaration of Robert G. Harris in Support of Request for Entry of Order by Default on Motion for Entry of Final Decree and Order Closing Bankruptcy Case
Att: 2 Certificate of Service