Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-50275

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:M Elaine Hammond
Case #: 5:21-ap-05058
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2021
Terminated:Jul 26, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Equinix, Inc.
Gray Cary Ware and Freidenrich 401 B St., Ste. 1700
San Diego, CA 92101
Represented By
Equinix, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Blade Global Corporation
67 E. Evelyn Ave, Ste 7
Mountain View, CA 94041
Represented By
Wendy W. Smith
Law Offices Of Binder And Malter
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
29 29 5 pgs notice Notice Tue 07/26 9:48 AM
Notice Regarding Dismissal with Prejudice per Court Order, Doc# 388 Filed by Plaintiff Blade Global Corporation. (Smith, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
court Close Adversary Case Tue 07/26 10:32 AM
Adversary Case Closed 5:21-ap-5058. (jf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
28 28 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 06/28 12:10 PM
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Defendant Equinix, Inc. (Djang, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
27 27 stip Continue Hearing Thu 06/09 11:53 AM
Stipulation to Continue Hearing (Joint Request to Continue Status Conference) Filed by Plaintiff Blade Global Corporation Related [+]. (Smith, Wendy)
Related: [-] 2 Notice
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Thu 06/09 2:21 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2022 at 01:00 PM in/via San Jose Courtroom 11 - Hammond. Continued by the court prior to the hearing. (acr)
Related: [-] 2 Notice
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
26 26 23 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/17 3:26 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Equinix, Inc.. (Djang, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
25 25 stip Dismiss Party Fri 05/06 4:22 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Party/Parties, Equinix, LLC without Prejudice . Filed by Plaintiff Blade Global Corporation. (Smith, Wendy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, May 02, 2022
24 24 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 05/03 11:23 AM
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Related [+] (acr)
Related: [-] 16
23 23 1 pgs audio audio Mon 05/02 10:30 PM
The Audio File attached to the PDF includes several hearings. Court Date & Time [ 5/2/2022 10:00:00 AM ]. File Size [ 16159 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:33:40 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 05/02 3:28 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in/via San Jose Courtroom 11 - Hammond. Appearances: Wendy Smith appearing on behalf of the plaintiff and Luke Murley for Equinix. Matter was continued to 6/13/22 at 10:00 a.m. (rdr)
Related: [-] 2 Notice
court Hearing Held (Bk) Mon 05/02 4:02 PM
Hearing Held Related [+]. Appearances: Wendy Smith appearing on behalf of the plaintiff and Luke Murley for Equinix. For the reasons stated on the record, Equinix's request to dismiss the amended complaint is denied. Court to issue the order. Ms. Smith to file a stipulated dismissal as to Equinix, LLC without prejudice. The deadline to file an answer to the complaint is on 5/17/22. (rdr)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Monday, April 25, 2022
22 22 misc Reply Mon 04/25 2:56 PM
Reply in Support Related [+]. Filed by Defendants Equinix, Inc., Equinix, LLC (Djang, Caroline)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Monday, April 18, 2022
21 21 misc Opposition Brief/Memorandum Mon 04/18 2:36 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Blade Global Corporation (Smith, Wendy)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
20 20 4 pgs misc Statement Tue 03/29 10:34 AM
Statement of Blade Global Corporation's Initial Disclosures Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Blade Global Corporation (Smith, Wendy)
Related: [-] 3 Discovery Order
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
19 19 audio audio Tue 03/15 10:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/14/2022 10:00:00 AM ]. File Size [ 32957 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:34:20 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 03/14 10:55 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2022 at 10:00 AM via San Jose Courtroom 11 - Hammond. Appearances: Robert Harris and Wendy Smith on behalf of the debtor, Mark Sharf as the Subchapter V trustee, John Hutton for Blade Acquisition, Jorge Gaitan for the UST, Steven Boyajian for 2CRSI, Michael Kasolas as Chief Restructuring Officer, Carolin Djang, Luke Murley, and Melissa Martinez for Equinix. The scheduling conference is continued to 5/2/222 at 10:00 a.m. The motion to dismiss will also be heard on 5/2/22 at 10:00 a.m. (acr)
Related: [-] 2 Notice
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Mon 03/14 10:56 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2022 at 10:00 AM via San Jose Courtroom 11 - Hammond. (acr)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, March 10, 2022
18 18 misc Document Thu 03/10 1:02 PM
Joint Document: Rule 26 Discovery Plan . Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Blade Global Corporation (Smith, Wendy)
Related: [-] 3 Discovery Order
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 24, 2022
order Judge Docket Order Thu 02/24 8:19 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) The motion to dismiss is off calendar on the basis that the motion is moot pursuant to the plaintiffs filing of a first amended complaint. No appearances required on February 28, 2022. Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Equinix, Inc., Defendant Equinix, LLC
court Hearing Dropped Thu 02/24 8:19 AM
Hearing Dropped Related [+]. Off calendar pursuant to the docket text order issued on 2/24/22. (acr)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Case
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 02/22 5:19 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/5/2022 at 11:00 AM via San Jose Courtroom 11 - Hammond. Filed by Defendants Equinix, Inc., Equinix, LLC. (Djang, Caroline)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Equinix, Inc., Defendant Equinix, LLC
16 16 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 02/22 5:16 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding //Dismiss Amended Complaint Filed by Defendants Equinix, Inc., Equinix, LLC. (Djang, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
15 15 misc Statement Mon 02/14 2:19 PM
Statement of Filing First Amended Complaint in Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Blade Global Corporation (Smith, Wendy)
Related: [-] 13 Amended Complaint
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
14 14 19 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/09 5:59 PM
Amended Complaint Re: (corrected) First Amended Complaint by Wendy W. Smith on behalf of Blade Global Corporation against all defendants. Related [+]. (Smith, Wendy)
Related: [-] 13 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Blade Global Corporation
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
13 13 12 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/08 5:53 PM
Amended Complaint by Wendy W. Smith on behalf of Blade Global Corporation against all defendants. Related [+]. (Smith, Wendy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Blade Global Corporation
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B
Att: 3 2 pgs Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 20, 2022
12 12 order Seal Document Thu 01/20 3:20 PM
Order Granting Motion To File Documents Under Seal Related [+] (acr)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
11 11 seal Proposed Document Filed Under Seal Tue 01/18 3:56 PM
Proposed Document Filed Under Seal Related [+]. Filed by Defendants Equinix, Inc., Equinix, LLC (Djang, Caroline)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to File a Document Under Seal filed by Defendant Equinix, Inc., Defendant Equinix, LLC
10 10 motion Motion to File a Document Under Seal Tue 01/18 3:53 PM
Motion to File a Document Under Seal . Filed by Defendants Equinix, Inc., Equinix, LLC (Djang, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Att: 2 Proposed Order-FRBP 4001
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 01/18 3:40 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 2/28/2022 at 11:00 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Filed by Defendants Equinix, Inc., Equinix, LLC. (Djang, Caroline)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Equinix, Inc., Defendant Equinix, LLC
8 8 motion Dismiss Case Tue 01/18 3:20 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Defendants Equinix, Inc., Equinix, LLC (Djang, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/28 2:58 PM
Certificate of Service of Complaint, Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet, Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference, Order re Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference, and Notice to Plaintiff re: Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program Info Sheet Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Blade Global Corporation (Smith, Wendy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Sunday, December 19, 2021
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/19 9:09 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 12/19/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/19 9:09 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 12/19/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Discovery Order
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/19 9:09 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 12/19/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Discovery Order
Friday, December 17, 2021
3 3 order Discovery Fri 12/17 4:09 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (jf)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice Fri 12/17 3:22 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference In An Adversary Procceding Related [+]. (jf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Blade Global Corporation
court Hearing Set (Adv) Fri 12/17 3:30 PM
Hearing Se Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 3/14/2022 at 10:00 AM, 280 S. First St, 3rd Floor, Courtroom 11, San Jose CA or by Zoom. For details: See https://www.canb.uscourts.gov/judge/hammond/calendar. (jf)
Related: [-] 2 Summons
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
cmp Request for Alias Summons to be Issued Tue 12/14 9:18 AM
Request for Alias Summons to be Issued on Equinix, Inc.. Reason: File a Motion or Answer to the Complaint. Related [+]. (Smith, Wendy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Blade Global Corporation
Monday, December 13, 2021
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/13 9:19 AM
Adversary case 21-05058 12 Related [+], 14, 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)) Complaint by Blade Global Corporation against Equinix, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (Smith, Wendy)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet