Terkel v. Centers for Disease
Original Case: 6:20-cv-00564
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-usc-40137 |
Type | united states civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Mar 03, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 19, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 20, 2021 3:31 AM CDT |
Amicus Curiae
Kathryn M. Leifheit
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ChangeLab Solutions
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Children's Healthwatch
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
George Consortium
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
GLMA Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Hispanic Medical Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Medical Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Public Health Law Watch
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Southern Poverty Law Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Texas Low Income Housing Information Service
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Emily A. Benfer
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Kim M. Blankenship
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Katherine L. Chen
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Gregg Gonsalves
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Peter Hepburn
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Danya E. Keene
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Center for Health Policy and Law at Northeastern University School of Law
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Michael Z. Levy
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Sabriya A. Linton
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Craig E. Pollack
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Julia Raifman
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Gabriel L. Schwartz
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
David Vlahov
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Cato Institute
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Randy E. Barnett
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Reason Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Individual Rights Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Independence Institutute
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
State of Texas
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Texas Apartment Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Association of Home Builders
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American Medical Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Constitutional Accountability Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
The Buckeye Institute
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
COVID-19 Eviction Defense Project
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Matthew Desmond
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Low Income Housing Coalition
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Connect Community
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Come Dream Come Build
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Texas
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Barry Friedman
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Leah Litman
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Texas Appleseed
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Housing Law Project
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American Academy of Pediatrics
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
American Civil Liberties Union
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Center for Disease Control and Prevention
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Rochelle P. Walensky, in her official capacity as Director of the Centers for Diseas Control and Prevention
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Sherri A. Berger, in her official capacity as Acting Chief of Staff for the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
United States Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Rochelle P. Walensky, in her official capacity as Director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Xavier Becerra, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Lauren Terkel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MacDonald Property Management, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Weatherford Meadow Vista Apartments, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Lakeridge Apartments, Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Lufkin Creekside Apartments II, Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Lufkin Creekside Apartments, Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Pineywoods Arcadia Home Team, Limited
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/20/2021 3:31 AM CDT |
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
3 pgs US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Sherri A. Berger, Center for Disease Control and Prevention, Mr. Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, HHS, USA and Ms. Rochelle P. Walensky 21-40137 (ABT) |