Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Brian C Wimes
Case #: 4:21-cv-00152
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2021
Re-opened:Jan 17, 2024
Terminated:Feb 12, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Jackson County, MO, 2116-CV05206
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 07, 2021 4:00 AM CDT
Defendant
Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Stacy M Bunck
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart-Kcmo
contact info
Defendant
Catalent CTS (Kansas City), LLC
Represented By
Stacy M Bunck
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart-Kcmo
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah J. Lightner
Represented By
Ryan Patrick McEnaney
Siro Smith Dickson, PC
contact info
Eric W Smith
Siro Smith Dickson PC
contact info
Raymond Dake
Siro Smith Dickson, PC
contact info
Athena M. Dickson
Siro Smith Dickson, PC
contact info
Rik N. Siro
Siro Smith Dickson, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
100 100 order Order Wed 04/17 2:37 PM
The Court hereby acknowledges receipt of Doc.99 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party to pay their own costs. Signed on 4/17/24 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]
99 99 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/17 12:26 PM
STIPULATION of dismissal Joint by Deborah J. Lightner. (Dake, Raymond)
Related: [-]