Original Case: 4:21-cv-00152

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-02452
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2022
Terminated:Dec 26, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Dec 28, 2023 2:20 AM CST
Defendant
Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC
Defendant - Appellee
Catalent CTS (Kansas City), LLC
Represented By
Stacy Murrow Bunck
OGLETREE & DEAKINS
contact info
David Lawrence Schenberg
OGLETREE & DEAKINS
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Deborah J. Lightner
Represented By
Athena M. Dickson
SIRO & SMITH
contact info
Ryan Patrick McEnaney
SIRO & SMITH
contact info
Rik N. Siro
SIRO & SMITH
contact info
Eric W. Smith
SIRO & SMITH
contact info
Raymond A. Dake
SIRO & SMITH
contact info

GPO Dec 26 2023
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Steven M. Colloton, L. Steven Grasz and Jonathan A. Kobes (PUBLISHED)
AUTHORING JUDGE: L. Steven Grasz [5347720] [22-2452]

Docket last updated: 12/28/2023 2:20 AM CST
Friday, July 08, 2022
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [5175448] 22-2452 (CMH)
Related: [-]
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order and Judgment 6/10/2022. [5175450] 22-2452 (CMH)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Transcript due on or before 08/17/2022. Appendix due 08/29/2022. BRIEF APPELLANT, Deborah J. Lightner due 08/29/2022
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5175453] 22-2452 (CMH)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by Raymond A. Dake for Appellant Ms. Deborah J. Lightner w/service 07/08/2022 [5175554] 22-2452 (RAD)
Related: [-]