North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Richard E Myers, II
Case #: 7:21-cv-00045
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2021
Terminated:Jul 09, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 07, 2021 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Attorney General of North Carolina
Defendant
Mark Zieberth
Defendant
Rose Wilder
Defendant
James Wilder
Defendant
Judge Ronald Weiss
Defendant
US Department of Justice
Defendant
Judge Emmett Sullivan
Defendant
Pender County Public Defenders Office
Defendant
Pender County NC Prosecutor
Defendant
Pender County NC Court
Defendant
Owner of 1002 Unit 1 Grace Street Wilmington NC 28401
Defendant
Judge Richard Nygaard
Defendant
North Carolina State Troopers
Defendant
New Hanover NC Prosecutor
Defendant
New Hanover County Public Defenders Office
Defendant
Judge Frederick Motz
Defendant
Judge Diane Motz
Defendant
Judge Norman Moon
Defendant
Judge James Parker Jones
Defendant
Judge Malcolm Jones Howard
Defendant
Judge Roger Gregory
Defendant
Judge Morton Greenberg
Defendant
Judge Douglas Ginsberg
Defendant
Judge James Gates
Defendant
Judge Julio Fuentes
Defendant
Judge Louise Flanagan
Defendant
Federal Agent in 300 Block N 13th Street Wilmington, NC 28401
Defendant
Judge Legrome Davis
Defendant
Bivens v Unknown Federal Agents
Plaintiff
Lawrence Verline Wilder
1101 Chestnut Street
Wilmington, NC 28401


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 09, 2021
11 11 order Judgment Fri 07/09 1:55 PM
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that in accordance with the court's order entered at Docket Entry 10 on July 9, 2021, the Memorandum and Recommendation [DE-9] is ADOPTED and Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/9/2021. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Memorandum and Recommendations Fri 07/09 1:47 PM
ORDER adopting 9 Memorandum and Recommendation and for the reasons stated therein DISMISSES the case for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the court's order. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 7/9/2021. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
utility Motion Submitted Wed 06/30 2:30 PM
Motions Submitted to Chief US District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and9 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
9 9 3 pgs motion Memorandum and Recommendations Mon 06/14 11:14 AM
MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION regarding 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is RECOMMENDED that the case be DISMISSED for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the court's order at DE- 3 . Plaintiff shall have until June 28, 2021 to file written objections to the Memorandum andRecommendation. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 6/14/2021. (Copy of order sent to Lawrence Verline Wilder, 1101 Chestnut Street, Wilmington, NC 28401 via US Mail.) (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 11, 2021
8 8 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 06/11 3:06 PM
MANDATE of US Court of Appeals as to4 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Lawrence Verline Wilder. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]
7 7 appeal USCA Order Fri 06/11 3:05 PM
ORDER of US Court of Appeals dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute as to4 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Lawrence Verline Wilder. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
6 6 appeal USCA Case Number Fri 04/09 4:05 PM
US Court of Appeals Case Number 21-1391 (Jennifer Rice, Case Manager) as to4 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Lawrence Verline Wilder. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
5 5 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Thu 04/08 10:32 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals regarding4 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]
4 4 appeal Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory Thu 04/08 9:32 AM
Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Lawrence Verline Wilder. (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
appeal Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA Thu 04/08 10:38 AM
Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4th Circuit Court of Appeals regarding4 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/16 4:00 PM
ORDER regarding 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to correct the deficiencies listed above and return the corrected documents within fourteen (14) days from the filing of this order. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide all the necessary forms regarding the deficiencies above to Plaintiff for completion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 3/16/2021. (Copy of Order and blank summonses (29), IFP application, and notice of self representation sent to Lawrence Verline Wilder, 1101 Chestnut Street, Wilmington, NC 28401 via US Mail.) (Waddell, K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
2 2 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 03/15 8:32 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Lawrence Verline Wilder (Form is incomplete). (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/15 8:29 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Lawrence Verline Wilder. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Complalint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons