Original Case: 7:21-cv-00045

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv.us-01391
Typecivil u.s. / united states
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2021
Terminated:Jun 11, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jun 14, 2021 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE JAMES E. GATES
Defendant - Appellee
NORTH CAROLINA STATE TROOPERS
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Defendant - Appellee
NORTH CAOLINA STATE TROOPERS
Defendant - Appellee
ROSE WILDER
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES WILDER
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE MORTON I. GREENBERG
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE JULIO FUENTES
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE RICHARD NYGAARD
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE RONALD WEISS
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE LEGROME DAVIS
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE ROGER L. GREGORY
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE FREDERICK MOTZ
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE DIANA GRIBBON MOTZ
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE DOUGLAS GINSBERG
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE EMMET G. SULLIVAN
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE JAMES P. JONES
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE NORMAN K. MOON, Federal Judge of Virginia and District of Columbia
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE LOUISE W. FLANAGAN
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE MALCOLM J. HOWARD
Defendant - Appellee
MARK ZIEBERTH, ICE Agent
Defendant - Appellee
NEW HANOVER COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE
Defendant - Appellee
PENDER COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE
Defendant - Appellee
FEDERAL AGENT IN 300 BLOCK N 13TH STREET WILMONGTON, NC 28401
Defendant - Appellee
OWNER OF 1002 UNIT 1 GRACE STREET WILMINGTON NC 28401
Defendant - Appellee
US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Defendant - Appellee
BIVENS V UNKNOWN FEDERAL AGENTS
Defendant - Appellee
PENDER COUNTY NC PROSECUTOR
Defendant - Appellee
NEW HANOVER NC PROSECUTOR
Defendant - Appellee
ATTORNEY GENERAL OF NORTH CAROLINA
Defendant - Appellee
PENDER COUNTY NC COURT
Plaintiff - Appellant
LAWRENCE VERLINE WILDER, SR.
Represented By
Lawrence Verline Wilder Sr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/14/2021 4:27 AM EDT
Friday, April 09, 2021
1 1 2 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:21-cv-00045-M. Case manager: JRice. 21-1391 JR [Entered: 04/09/2021 10:38 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Lawrence Verline Wilder, Sr. - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 05/10/2021 Originating case number: 7:21-cv-00045-M. Mailed to: Lawrence Wilder. 21-1391 JR [Entered: 04/09/2021 10:41 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Fee notice
Att: 2 6 pgs IFP application
3 3 11 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Lawrence WIlder. Informal Opening Brief due 05/03/2021 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 21-1391 JR [Entered: 04/09/2021 10:44 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 7:21-cv-00045-M. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. 21-1391 JR [Entered: 04/09/2021 10:49 AM]
Related: [-]