California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:21-cv-02313
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2021
Terminated:Jul 20, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 12, 2021 3:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Los Angeles Unified School District
Represented By
Barrett K Green
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Defendant
United Teachers Los Angeles
Represented By
P Casey Pitts
Altshuler Berzon LLP
contact info
Lisa C Demidovich
Bush Gottlieb Alc
contact info
Scott A Kronland
Altshuler Berzon LLP
contact info
Ira Lawrence Gottlieb
Bush Gottlieb Alc
contact info
Defendant
Rob Bonta
Represented By
Kristin A. Liska
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Glenn Laird
Represented By
Elena Marie Ives
Freedom Foundation
contact info
Timothy R Snowball
Freedom Foundation
contact info


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
51 51 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 12/21 7:08 AM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals45 , CCA # 22-55780 The judgment of this Court, entered October 23, 2023, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum49 AFFIRMED.](mat)
Related: [-]