Original Case: 2:21-cv-02313

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-55780
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2022
Terminated:Oct 23, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Aug 25, 2022 1:27 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED TEACHERS LOS ANGELES, a labor organization
Represented By
Lisa Demidovich
Bush Gottlieb, A Law Corporation
contact info
Scott A. Kronland
Altshuler Berzon LLP
contact info
P. Casey Pitts
Altshuler Berzon LLP
contact info
Luke Taylor
Bush Gottlieb, A Law Corporation
contact info
Ira L. Gottlieb
Bush Gottlieb, A Law Corporation
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, a political subdivision of the State of California
Represented By
Barrett Green
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROB BONTA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California
Represented By
Kristin Liska
AGCA - Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
GLENN LAIRD, individual
Represented By
Timothy R. Snowball
Freedom Foundation
contact info
Shella Sadovnik Alcabes
Freedom Foundation
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/24/2023 3:05 AM PDT
Friday, August 19, 2022
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Glenn Laird Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/26/2022. Appellant Glenn Laird opening brief due 10/17/2022. Appellees Rob Bonta, Los Angeles Unified School District and United Teachers Los Angeles answering brief due 11/16/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12521439] (JBS) [Entered: 08/19/2022 02:37 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet
2 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Luke R. Taylor (Bush Gottlieb, ALC, 801 N. Brand Boulevard, Suite 950, Glendale, CA 91203) for Appellee UTLA. Date of service: 08/19/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12521589] 22-55780 (Taylor, Luke) [Entered: 08/19/2022 03:24 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 Added Attorney(s) Luke Taylor for party(s) Appellee UTLA, in case 22-55780 [12521633] (QDL) [Entered: 08/19/2022 03:39 PM]
Related: [-]