Original Case: 1:98-cv-01517

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cvpri-07025
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2021
Terminated:Jun 24, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jun 27, 2022 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Hilton Hotel Retirement Plan
Represented By
Andrew McHie Lacy
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Hilton Hotels Corporation
Represented By
Andrew McHie Lacy
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
James M. Anderson, members of the Hilton Hotels Retirement Plan Committee
Represented By
Andrew McHie Lacy
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Matthew J. Hart, members of the Hilton Hotels Retirement Plan Committee
Represented By
Andrew McHie Lacy
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Barron Hilton
Represented By
Andrew McHie Lacy
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Dieter Huckestein, members of the Hilton Hotels Retirement Plan Committee
Represented By
Andrew McHie Lacy
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Sam D. Young, Jr., members of the Hilton Hotels Retirement Plan Committee
Represented By
Andrew McHie Lacy
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Hilton Hotels Retirement Plan
Represented By
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jamal J. Kifafi, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By
Stephen Robert Bruce
Stephen R. Bruce Law Offices
contact info

GPO Jun 24 2022
PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1951924] filed (without memorandum) that the judgment of the District Court be REVERSED and the case REMANDED. (SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS) withholding issuance of the mandate. Before Judges: Wilkins, Katsas and Walker. [21-7025]

Docket last updated: 06/27/2022 4:25 AM EDT
Thursday, March 18, 2021
PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. 21-7025
Related: [-]
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1890553] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:98-cv-01517-CKK filed by Jamal J. Kifafi. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-7025 21-7025
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [1890555] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 04/19/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 04/19/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 04/19/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 04/19/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 04/19/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 04/19/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 04/19/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 04/19/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/03/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 04/19/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 04/19/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 04/19/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/03/2021 21-7025
Related: [-]