Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:21-ap-01099
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2021
Terminated:Apr 25, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheater Parkway
Mountainview, CA 94043
Represented By
Google Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan Nisselson, Chapter 7 Trustee of Sizmek, Inc., et al.,
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
16 16 order So Ordered Stipulation Tue 04/25 9:28 AM
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 4/25/2023 Voluntarily Dismissing this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 04/25 9:29 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1099 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
15 15 misc Stipulation Mon 04/24 3:22 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
14 14 order So Ordered Stipulation Fri 12/02 10:01 AM
Stipulated Order Signed on 12/2/2022 Extending the Dispositive Motions Deadline. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
13 13 misc Stipulation Wed 11/30 12:37 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending the Dispositive Motions Deadline. Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Google Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
12 12 order So Ordered Stipulation Fri 07/29 2:25 PM
Confidentiality Agreement and Stipulated Protective Order Signed on 7/29/2022. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Stipulation Fri 07/29 12:22 PM
Stipulation Confidentiality Agreement and Stipulated Protective Order. Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/05 9:19 AM
Certificate of Service Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to Google Inc. dba Doubleclick Inc., First Set of Request for Admissions and Request for Production filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/19 12:13 PM
Certificate of Service Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
8 8 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Tue 11/30 11:07 AM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by James Christopher Vandermark on behalf of Google Inc.. (Vandermark, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
7 7 notice Affidavit of Service Wed 05/12 11:08 AM
Affidavit of Service of Order Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, May 10, 2021
6 6 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/10 2:49 PM
Third Order Signed on 5/10/2021 on Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by The Trustee. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
5 5 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 04/21 7:09 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement . Filed by Andrew E. Arthur on behalf of Google Inc..(Arthur, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
4 4 answer None Wed 04/21 6:31 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Andrew E. Arthur on behalf of Google Inc..(Arthur, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1 2 ,1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/23 12:58 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 03/23 9:28 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (DSJ), Answer due by 4/22/2021, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 03/23 8:50 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 21-01099 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 635. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (Ortiz)
Related: [-] Doc #1
Monday, March 22, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 03/22 1:11 PM
Adversary case 21-01099 Complaint against Google Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A