Nisselson v. Sublime Skinz Labs SA
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | David S Jones |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-01102 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 25, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Sublime Skinz Labs SA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Nisselson, Chapter 7 Trustee of Sizmek, Inc., et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 05/25 1:12 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1102 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
||
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Judgment signed on 11/17/2022. Judgment entered that Plaintiff be awarded a default judgment against the Defendant, Sublime Skinz Labs SA, in a total judgment of $123,019.52. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 22,0068 (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
Thursday, November 10, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Order for Default Judgment Signed on 11/10/2022. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson.(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Amended Notice of Presentment filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. with presentment to be held on 10/25/2022 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) Objections due by 10/24/2022,(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() Motion for Default Judgment filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. with hearing to be held on 10/25/2022 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) Responses due by 10/24/2022, (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default . Notice Date 09/22/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default against Sublime Skinz Labs SA (Lopez, Mary) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson.(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, April 01, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Affidavit of Service filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Wednesday, May 12, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Affidavit of Service of Order filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Monday, May 10, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Third Order Signed on 5/10/2021 on Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by The Trustee. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Monday, April 19, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Sublime Skinz Labs SA . (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Tue 03/23 8:50 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 21-01102 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 635. Fee amount 350.00. (Ortiz) |
||
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-01102 Complaint against Sublime Skinz Labs SA (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |