Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:21-ap-01103
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2021
Terminated:May 02, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Verizon Communications Inc.
One Verizon Way
Basking Ridge, NJ 07920
Represented By
Verizon Communications Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan Nisselson, Chapter 7 Trustee of Sizmek, Inc., et al.
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, May 02, 2022
14 14 order So Ordered Stipulation Mon 05/02 4:25 PM
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 5/2/2022 Voluntarily Dismissing this Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 13
13 13 misc Stipulation Mon 05/02 1:52 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 05/02 4:26 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1103 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/05 9:51 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Scheduling of Mediation filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson.(McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Scheduling of Mediation
Friday, April 01, 2022
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/01 9:43 AM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
10 10 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/23 9:40 AM
Order Signed on 6/23/2021 Admitting Darrell W. Clark to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 7
9 9 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/23 9:38 AM
Order Signed on 6/23/2021 Admitting Tracey M. Ohm to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, June 21, 2021
8 8 answer None Mon 06/21 4:56 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Tracey M Ohm on behalf of Verizon Communications Inc.. (Ohm, Tracey)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, June 17, 2021
7 7 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 06/17 5:59 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Darrell W. Clark on behalf of Verizon Communications Inc.. (Clark, Darrell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 06/17 5:44 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Tracey M Ohm on behalf of Verizon Communications Inc.. (Ohm, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 06/17 5:47 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 21-01103 dsj] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15397759. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #6
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 06/17 5:47 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 21-01103 dsj] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15397759. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #6
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 06/17 6:01 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 21-01103 dsj] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15397771. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #7
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
5 5 notice Affidavit of Service Wed 05/12 11:12 AM
Affidavit of Service of Order Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 4
Monday, May 10, 2021
4 4 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/10 2:52 PM
Third Order Signed on 5/10/2021 on Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by The Trustee. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/23 1:01 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 03/23 9:28 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (DSJ), Answer due by 4/22/2021, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 03/23 8:50 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 21-01103 dsj] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 635. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (Ortiz)
Related: [-] Doc #1
Monday, March 22, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 03/22 1:24 PM
Adversary case 21-01103 Complaint against Verizon Communications Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Alan Nisselson. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A