Ashfield Health LLC v. Jacobson
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Victor A Bolden |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00417 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 07, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 21, 2021 5:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Matthew Jacobson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Apollo Medical Communications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angela Jacobson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allison Valentine
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Apollo Medical Communications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashfield Health LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
notice
Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
Wed 03/22 2:51 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Murphy, Tatihana) |