BOVA v. ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. et al
North Carolina Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Osteen, Jr |
Referred: | L Patrick Auld |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00274 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 28, 2021 5:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.
|
|
Defendant
ABBVIE, INC.
|
|
Defendant
KOS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
MARLON SULLIVAN
|
|
Plaintiff
DAVID J. BOVA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/20/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
81 | 81
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 5:07 PM
ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 04/29/2024, that the parties Notice of Stipulation of Dismissal in Exchange for Waiver of Costs, (Doc.78 ), is APPROVED. Each party shall bear its own costs. (al) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
80 | 80
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 04/26 10:21 AM
RULE 42(b) MANDATE of USCA as to70 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID J. BOVA, this court's order dismissing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 42(b) takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. USCA Case Number: 24-1304 (cc) |
|
79 | 79
1
pgs
appeal
Order
Fri 04/26 10:15 AM
USCA ORDER Upon consideration of the motion to voluntarily dismiss this case pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, and there appearing no opposition, the court grants the motion. USCA Case Number 24-1304 (cc) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
78 | 78
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 04/25 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal in exchange for Waiver of Costs by DAVID J. BOVA(BATEMAN, VALERIE) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Case Referred to Judge
Thu 04/25 4:42 PM
CASE REFERRED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., re:78 NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal in exchange for Waiver of Costs. (jd) |