David Bova v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Original Case: 1:21-cv-00274
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.pr-01304 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 29, 2024 6:18 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ABBVIE, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KOS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MARLON SULLIVAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN DOE, PLAN ADMINISTRATOR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID J. BOVA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 6:17 AM EDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00274-WO-LPA. Case manager: RachelPhillips. [1001550762] 24-1304 RP [Entered: 04/10/2024 03:29 PM] | |
2 | 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00274-WO-LPA. Mailed to: Jennifer T. Beach and Stephanie Scharf. [1001550767] 24-1304 RP [Entered: 04/10/2024 03:32 PM] |