Swint et al v. Mueller et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Laura Taylor Swain |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-02966 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 02, 2021 7:50 AM EDT |
Defendant
John W. Dean, III
|
|
Defendant
Fallout 76
|
|
Defendant
Robert S. Mueller, III
|
|
Defendant
New York Times
|
|
Defendant
Hurricane Sandy
|
|
Plaintiff
James Stanley Dean
Oregon State Hospital 2600 Center St. NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Marie Lawlor
Oregon State Hospital 2600 Center St. NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
|
Plaintiff
Chrystal Marie Meyer
Oregon State Hospital 2600 Center St. NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
|
Plaintiff
Robert James Swint
Oregon State Hospital 2600 Center St. NE
Salem, OR 97301 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 07/22 4:15 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to4 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert James Swint. USCA Case Number 21-1193 Ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 7/22/2021..(nd) |
|
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 05/04 1:32 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from2 Order of Dismissal,3 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint). Document filed by Robert James Swint. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp) |
|
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 05/04 1:32 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:4 Notice of Appeal. (tp) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
Tue 05/04 1:33 PM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for4 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert James Swint were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) |
||
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Wed 04/14 8:57 AM
Mailed a copy of3 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint),2 Order of Dismissal, and Notice of Appeal Instructions to Robert James Swint at Oregon State Hospital, 2600 Center St. NE, Salem, OR 97301. (kh) |
||
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint)
Tue 04/13 4:56 PM
CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice to the pending action under case number 21-CV-2960 (CM). The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/13/2021) (sac) |
|
Att: 1 Pro Se Appeal Package | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Tue 04/13 4:54 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Plaintiff Robert James Swint, appearing pro se, brings this action alleging that Defendants violated his rights. The Court dismisses the complaint for the following reasons. Plaintiff has previously submitted to this Court an identical complaint that is pending under case number 21-CV-2960 (CM). Because this complaint raises the same claims against the same defendants, no useful purpose would be served by the filing and litigation of this duplicate lawsuit. Therefore, this complaint is dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff's pending action under case number 20-CV-2960 (CM). The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed as duplicative. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/13/2021) (sac) |
|
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte
Tue 04/13 1:09 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) |
||
Monday, April 05, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/07 3:06 PM
COMPLAINT against John W. Dean, III, Fallout 76, Sandra Marie Lawlor, Chrystal Marie Meyer, Robert S. Mueller, III, New York Times, Hurricane Sandy, Robert James Swint. Document filed by James Stanley Dean..(rdz) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/07 3:07 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz) |