Consolidated
Lead case: 1:21-md-03010

New York Southern District Court
Judge:P Kevin Castel
Case #: 1:21-cv-03446
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:2 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Apr 20, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Oct 17, 2021 6:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Alphabet Inc.
Represented By
Michael S Sommer
Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati P.C.
contact info
Jonathan M. Jacobson
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Defendant
Google LLC
Represented By
Michael S Sommer
Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati P.C.
contact info
Jonathan M. Jacobson
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Plaintiff
Associated Newspapers Ltd.
Represented By
John Thorne
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mail Media, Inc.
Represented By
John Thorne
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
142 142 misc Letter Thu 05/08 8:33 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Craig M. Reiser dated May 8, 2025 re: Opposition to Plaintiff Gannett Co., Inc and Plaintiffs Associated Newspapers Ltd. and Mail Media, Inc.'s Pre-Motion Letter [ECF No. 948]. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC Related [+]
Related: [-] iser, Craig
Friday, May 02, 2025
141 141 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/02 6:22 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Summary Judgment [REDACTED] addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Craig M. Reiser dated May 2, 2025. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC Related [+]
Related: [-] iser, Craig
140 140 misc Letter Fri 05/02 5:48 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne dated May 2, 2025 re: Request for Leave to File Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Gannett Co., Inc., Mail Media, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC.(Thorne, John)
Related: [-]