New York Southern District Court
Judge:P Kevin Castel
Case #: 1:21-md-03010
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:2 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
986 986 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne dated May 8, 2025 re: (79 in 1:23-cv-05177-PKC, 951 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 141 in 1:21-cv-03446-PKC) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Summary Judgment [REDACTED] addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Craig M. Reiser dated May 2, 2025. . Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Gannett Co., Inc., Mail Media, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC.(Thorne, John)
Related: [-]
985 985 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/08 10:57 PM
DECLARATION of Izaak Earnhardt in Opposition re: (949 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 182 in 1:21-cv-07034-PKC) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment as to Publishers First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated May 2, 2025.. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-19 Slipsheets
984 984 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/08 10:53 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Philip C. Korologos dated May 8, 2025 re: (949 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 182 in 1:21-cv-07034-PKC) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment as to Publishers First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated May 2, 2025. . Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
Related: [-]
983 983 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/08 10:21 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Izaak Earnhardt in Opposition re: (949 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 182 in 1:21-cv-07034-PKC) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment as to Publishers First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated May 2, 2025.. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Progressive, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Alphabet Inc., Alphabet Inc.(Delaware Corporation), Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gannett Co., Inc., Google L.L.C., Google LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Inform Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, Rumble Canada Inc., SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunny Singh, SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Michael Stellman(individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated ), Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra, Youtube, LLC, The Progressive, Inc, THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., Google L.L.C, Youtube L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKCMotion or Order to File Under Seal:981 .(Korologos, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-S. May 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript.,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-W. Kim Deposition Transcript,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-GOOG-AT-MDL-019853631,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- GOOG-DOJ-05252842,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5- GOOG-DOJ-12929689,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6- GOOG-AT-MDL-000915757,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7- GOOG-AT-MDL-019586925,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8- GOOG-DOJ-14257049,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9- GOOG-DOJ-10671724,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10- GOOG-DOJ-05247075,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - GOOG-DOJ-10948271,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12- GOOG-DOJ-12762188,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13- GOOG-DOJ-15627703,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - GOOG-DOJ-04992716,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15- GOOG-DOJ-28517565,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16- GOOG-DOJ-11781035,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17- GOOG-AT-MDL-016626308,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18- Israel Report,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19- Kroger Report
982 982 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/08 10:09 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Philip C. Korologos dated May 8, 2025 re: (949 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 182 in 1:21-cv-07034-PKC) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment as to Publishers First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated May 2, 2025. . Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Progressive, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Alphabet Inc., Alphabet Inc.(Delaware Corporation), Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gannett Co., Inc., Google L.L.C., Google LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Inform Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, Rumble Canada Inc., SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunny Singh, SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Michael Stellman(individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated ), Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra, Youtube, LLC, The Progressive, Inc, THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., Google L.L.C, Youtube L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKCMotion or Order to File Under Seal:981 .(Korologos, Philip)
Related: [-]
981 981 motion Seal Thu 05/08 10:01 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal Publisher Plaintiffs' response in opposition to Google's pre-motion letter for summary judgment addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Philip C. Korologos dated May 8, 2025. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
Related: [-]
980 980 misc Letter Thu 05/08 9:38 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated May 8, 2025 re: (967) LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated May 2, 2025 re: Pre-Motion Letter on Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-01530-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
Related: [-]
979 979 misc Letter Thu 05/08 9:03 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated May 8, 2025 re: LETTER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' LTR MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Inform Inc...(Vash, Serina)
Related: [-]
978 978 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/08 8:59 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated May 8, 2025 re: (229 in 1:21-cv-07001-PKC, 964 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment against Defendant Google LLC addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Dena C. Sharp and Tina Wolfson dated May 2, 2025. . Document filed by Google LLC, Alphabet Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07001-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
Related: [-]
977 977 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/08 8:52 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated May 8, 2025 re: (953 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 183 in 1:21-cv-07034-PKC) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Philip C. Korologos dated May 2, 2025. . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
Related: [-]
976 976 misc Letter Thu 05/08 8:33 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Craig M. Reiser dated May 8, 2025 re: Opposition to Plaintiff Gannett Co., Inc and Plaintiffs Associated Newspapers Ltd. and Mail Media, Inc.'s Pre-Motion Letter [ECF No. 948]. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC Related [+]
Related: [-] iser, Craig
975 975 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/08 6:59 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Class Advertisers dated 05/08/2025 re: (950 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 224 in 1:21-cv-07001-PKC) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment as to Advertisers Consolidated Advertiser Class Action Complaint, addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated May 2, 2025. Advertiser Plaintiffs Response to Googles Pre-Motion Letter Seeking Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF 950) . Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07001-PKC.(Wolfson, Tina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
974 974 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 05/07 1:04 PM
ORDER CONCERNING MOTIONS TO SEAL CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING granting973 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Court hereby grants Google's unopposed request to extend the deadline to move to seal portions of Publisher Plaintiffs' and Advertiser Plaintiffs' motions for class certification and supporting filings. Google shall file any motions to seal related to these filings by May 23, 2025. Pending the hearing and determination, the portions originally filed under seal shall remain sealed. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 5/23/2025.. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/7/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
973 973 2 pgs motion Extension of Time Tue 05/06 7:02 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Move to Seal Portions of Publisher Plaintiffs and Advertiser Plaintiffs Motions for Class Certification and Supporting Filings addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated May 6, 2025. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07001-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
972 972 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Tue 05/06 3:34 PM
ORDER granting (954) Letter Motion to Seal in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. Provisionally granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/6/2025) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC (ar)
Related: [-]
971 971 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 05/06 10:40 AM
ORDER granting970 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/6/2025) Attorney Sean Murray terminated (ar)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
970 970 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 05/05 2:14 PM
MOTION for Sean Murray to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC..(Murray, Sean)
Related: [-]
969 969 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 05/05 10:43 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:620 Notice (Other) filed by Google LLC, Youtube, LLC, Alphabet Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Michael S Sommer terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/5/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 03, 2025
968 968 misc Redacted Document Sat 05/03 12:09 AM
REDACTION to (965 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 230 in 1:21-cv-07001-PKC) MOTION to Certify Class . Joint Declaration of Dena Sharp and Tina Wolfson by Hanson Law Firm, PCFiled In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07001-PKC.(Sharp, Dena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-39 (Slip Sheet)
Friday, May 02, 2025
967 967 misc Letter Sat 05/03 12:08 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated May 2, 2025 re: Pre-Motion Letter on Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Inform Inc...(Vash, Serina)
Related: [-]
966 966 misc Redacted Document Sat 05/03 12:01 AM
REDACTION to (230 in 1:21-cv-07001-PKC) MOTION to Certify Class . Advertiser Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Certify A Class by Hanson Law Firm, PCFiled In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07001-PKC.(Sharp, Dena)
Related: [-]
965 965 motion Certify Class Fri 05/02 11:55 PM
MOTION to Certify Class . Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07001-PKC.(Sharp, Dena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order regarding Advertiser Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify A Class
964 964 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/02 11:48 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment against Defendant Google LLC addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Dena C. Sharp and Tina Wolfson dated May 2, 2025. Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07001-PKC.(Sharp, Dena)
Related: [-]
963 963 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 05/02 11:42 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Dena Sharp and Tina Wolfson in Support re: (225 in 1:21-cv-07001-PKC, 960 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Certify a Class and Exhibits 1-39 of the Joint Declaration of Dena Sharp and Tina Wolfson .. Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Alphabet Inc.(a Delaware Corporation), Google LLC, Alphabet Inc.(Delaware Corporation), Google LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07001-PKCMotion or Order to File Under Seal:960 .(Sharp, Dena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Report of Dr. Douglas Zona (Under Seal),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Reply Report of Dr. Douglas Zona (Under Seal),
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Report of Dr. Hal Singer (Under Seal),
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Reply Report of Dr. Hal Singer (Under Seal),
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Report of Dr. John Chandler (Under Seal),
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Report of Dr. Paul Milgrom (Under Seal),
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Report of Dr. Mark Israel (Under Seal),
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - GOOG-DOJ-09876316 (Under Seal),
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - GOOG-AT-MDL-008842383 (Under Seal),
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - GOOG-DOJ-04306227 (Under Seal),
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - GOOG-AT-MDL- 002051655 (Under Seal),
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - GOOG-AT-MDL- 001283154 (Under Seal),
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - GOOG-DOJ-13469175 (Under Seal),
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - GOOG-DOJ-12700489 (Under Seal),
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - GOOG-DOJ-13229710 (Under Seal),
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - GOOG-DOJ-02854344 (Under Seal),
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - GOOG-DOJ-AT-01130405 (Under Seal),
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - GOOG-AT-MDL- 008989727 (Under Seal),
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 - GOOG-AT-MDL-B- 005916960 (Under Seal),
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 - GOOG-AT-MDL- 008842393 (Under Seal),
Att: 21 Exhibit 21 - GOOG-DOJ-AT-01680260 (Under Seal),
Att: 22 Exhibit 22 - GOOG-DOJ-15600216 (Under Seal),
Att: 23 Exhibit 23 - GOOG-DOJ-AT-01490095 (Under Seal),
Att: 24 Exhibit 24 - GOOG-DOJ-09714662 (Under Seal),
Att: 25 Exhibit 25 - GOOG-DOJ-01856500 (Under Seal),
Att: 26 Exhibit 26 - GOOG-DOJ-AT-02204351 (Under Seal),
Att: 27 Exhibit 27 - GOOG-DOJ-09713317 (Under Seal),
Att: 28 Exhibit 28 - GOOG-DOJ-12866023-R (Under Seal),
Att: 29 Exhibit 29 - GOOG-AT-MDL-C- 000058277 (Under Seal),
Att: 30 Exhibit 30 - GOOG-DOJ-15140608 (Under Seal),
Att: 31 Exhibit 31 - GOOG-DOJ-02857290 (Under Seal),
Att: 32 Exhibit 32 - GOOG-AT-MDL-B- 007778984 (Under Seal),
Att: 33 Exhibit 33 - GOOG-DOJ-06852416 (Under Seal),
Att: 34 Exhibit 34 - GOOG-DOJ-06853424 (Under Seal),
Att: 35 Exhibit 35 - Excerpts of the April 18, 2025 Deposition of Dr. Paul Milgrom (Under Seal),
Att: 36 Exhibit 36 - Excerpts of the April 1, 2025 Deposition of Dr. Mark Israel (Under Seal),
Att: 37 Exhibit 37 - Excerpts of the July 12, 2024 Deposition of Nitish Korula (Under Seal),
Att: 38 Exhibit 38 - January 31, 2024 Letter from B. Zweifach to M. Bock (Under Seal),
Att: 39 Exhibit 39 - PUBMATIC_DOJ- 00012158 (Under Seal)
962 962 respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 05/02 10:59 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (225 in 1:21-cv-07001-PKC, 960 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Certify a Class and Exhibits 1-39 of the Joint Declaration of Dena Sharp and Tina Wolfson . . Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Alphabet Inc.(a Delaware Corporation), Google LLC, Alphabet Inc.(Delaware Corporation), Google LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07001-PKCMotion or Order to File Under Seal:960 .(Sharp, Dena)
Related: [-]
961 961 4 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 05/02 10:33 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (225 in 1:21-cv-07001-PKC) MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Certify a Class and Exhibits 1-39 of the Joint Declaration of Dena Sharp and Tina Wolfson . . Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07001-PKC.(Sharp, Dena)
Related: [-]
960 960 motion Seal Fri 05/02 10:26 PM
MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Certify a Class and Exhibits 1-39 of the Joint Declaration of Dena Sharp and Tina Wolfson . Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07001-PKC.(Sharp, Dena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Advertiser Class Plaintiffs Motion to Seal
959 959 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 05/02 9:19 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Izaak Earnhardt in Support re: (955 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 185 in 1:21-cv-07034-PKC) MOTION to Certify Class , to appoint Class representatives, and appoint co-lead counsel for the Classes .. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Progressive, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Alphabet Inc., Alphabet Inc.(Delaware Corporation), Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gannett Co., Inc., Google L.L.C., Google LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Inform Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, Rumble Canada Inc., SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunny Singh, SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Michael Stellman(individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated ), Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra, Youtube, LLC, The Progressive, Inc, THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., Google L.L.C, Youtube L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKCMotion or Order to File Under Seal:954 .(Korologos, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Elhauge Report,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Elhauge Report Errata,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Corrected Elhauge Rebuttal Report,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - E. Elhauge Deposition Transcript,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Das Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Das Rebuttal Report,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - A. Das Deposition Transcript,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Cramton Report,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Cramton Rebuttal Report,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Leonard Report,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - G. Leonard Deposition Transcript,
Att: 12 Exhibit 16 - GOOG-DOJ-02139596,
Att: 13 Exhibit 17 - GOOG-DOJ-06845250,
Att: 14 Exhibit 18 - E. Lipkovitz Deposition Transcript,
Att: 15 Exhibit 19 - S. Spencer Deposition Transcript,
Att: 16 Exhibit 20 - GOOG-DOJ-31847985,
Att: 17 Exhibit 21 - GOOG-DOJ-27792007,
Att: 18 Exhibit 22 - GOOG-TEX-00089241,
Att: 19 Exhibit 23 - GOOG-DOJ-04830048,
Att: 20 Exhibit 24 - GOOG-DOJ-AT-00597161,
Att: 21 Exhibit 25 - GOOG-DOJ-14024199,
Att: 22 Exhibit 26 - N. Korula 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript,
Att: 23 Exhibit 27 - GOOG-AT-MDL-008842393,
Att: 24 Exhibit 28 - GOOG-DOJ-02857276,
Att: 25 Exhibit 29 - A. Shellhammer Deposition Transcript,
Att: 26 Exhibit 30 - GOOG-DOJ-13228856,
Att: 27 Exhibit 31 - GOOG-DOJ-AT-01902619,
Att: 28 Exhibit 32 - GOOG-DOJ-14162335,
Att: 29 Exhibit 34 - GOOG-TEX-00453305,
Att: 30 Exhibit 35 - GOOG-DOJ-13473146,
Att: 31 Exhibit 36 - GOOG-DOJ-AT-01680260,
Att: 32 Exhibit 37 - GOOG-AT-MDL-001390901,
Att: 33 Exhibit 38 - GOOG-TEX-00096393,
Att: 34 Exhibit 39 - GOOG-AT-MDL-002295032,
Att: 35 Exhibit 40 - N. Jayaram 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript,
Att: 36 Exhibit 41 - N. Jayaram 30(b)(1) Deposition Transcript,
Att: 37 Exhibit 42 - GOOG-AT-MDL-011538685,
Att: 38 Exhibit 43 - GOOG-AT-MDL-008517180,
Att: 39 Exhibit 44 - GOOG-TEX-00691300,
Att: 40 Exhibit 46 - T. Schneider Deposition Transcript,
Att: 41 Exhibit 49 - GOOG-DOJ-AT-00198548,
Att: 42 Exhibit 50 - GOOG-DOJ-AT-02118627,
Att: 43 Exhibit 51 - GOOG-DOJ-09470144,
Att: 44 Exhibit 52 - GOOG-DOJ-02852767,
Att: 45 Exhibit 53 - GOOG-TEX-00302454,
Att: 46 Exhibit 54 - GOOG-DOJ-02148005,
Att: 47 Exhibit 55 - GOOG-TEX-00532696,
Att: 48 Exhibit 56 - GOOG-DOJ-AT-02199478,
Att: 49 Exhibit 57 - GOOG-DOJ-05276794,
Att: 50 Exhibit 59 - GOOG-DOJ-12074410,
Att: 51 Exhibit 60 - GOOG-DOJ-02732514,
Att: 52 Exhibit 61 - GOOG-AT-MDL-007214166,
Att: 53 Exhibit 62 - G. Levitte Deposition Transcript
958 958 respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 05/02 8:51 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (185 in 1:21-cv-07034-PKC, 955 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Certify Class , to appoint Class representatives, and appoint co-lead counsel for the Classes . . Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Progressive, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Alphabet Inc., Alphabet Inc.(Delaware Corporation), Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gannett Co., Inc., Google L.L.C., Google LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Inform Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, Rumble Canada Inc., SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunny Singh, SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Michael Stellman(individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated ), Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra, Youtube, LLC, The Progressive, Inc, THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., Google L.L.C, Youtube L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKCMotion or Order to File Under Seal:954 .(Korologos, Philip)
Related: [-]
957 957 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 05/02 8:42 PM
DECLARATION of Izaak Earnhardt in Support re: (955 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 185 in 1:21-cv-07034-PKC) MOTION to Certify Class , to appoint Class representatives, and appoint co-lead counsel for the Classes .. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Slipsheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Slipsheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Slipsheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4- Slipsheet,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5- Slipsheet,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6- Slipsheet,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7- Slipsheet,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8- Slipsheet,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9- Slipsheet,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10-Slipsheet,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11- Slipsheet,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - M. Israel Trial Testimony 9.26.2024 AM,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Philip C. Korologos,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Carol O'Keefe,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 -Declaration of Eric L. Cramer,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - Slipsheet,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - Slipsheet,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - Slipsheet,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 - Slipsheet,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 - Slipsheet,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21 - Slipsheet,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22 - Slipsheet,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23 - Slipsheet,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24 - Slipsheet,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25 - Slipsheet,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26 - Slipsheet,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27 - Slipsheet,
Att: 28 Exhibit 28 - Slipsheet,
Att: 29 Exhibit 29 - Slipsheet,
Att: 30 Exhibit 30 - Slipsheet,
Att: 31 Exhibit 31 - Slipsheet,
Att: 32 Exhibit 32 - Slipsheet,
Att: 33 Exhibit 33 - Leonard & Haider, Proving Antitrust Damages (2017),
Att: 34 Exhibit 34- Slipsheet,
Att: 35 Exhibit 35- Slipsheet,
Att: 36 Exhibit 36- Slipsheet,
Att: 37 Exhibit 37- Slipsheet,
Att: 38 Exhibit 38- Slipsheet,
Att: 39 Exhibit 39- Slipsheet,
Att: 40 Exhibit 40- Slipsheet,
Att: 41 Exhibit 41- Slipsheet,
Att: 42 Exhibit 42- Slipsheet,
Att: 43 Exhibit 43- Slipsheet,
Att: 44 Exhibit 44- Slipsheet,
Att: 45 Exhibit 45 - Google Reply MTD in US v. Google,
Att: 46 Exhibit 46-Slipsheet,
Att: 47 Exhibit 47 - S. Cabildo Deposition Transcript,
Att: 48 Exhibit 48 - N. Stockwell Deposition Transcript,
Att: 49 Exhibit 49 - Slipsheet,
Att: 50 Exhibit 50- Slipsheet,
Att: 51 Exhibit 51- Slipsheet,
Att: 52 Exhibit 52- Slipsheet,
Att: 53 Exhibit 53- Slipsheet,
Att: 54 Exhibit 54- Slipsheet,
Att: 55 Exhibit 55- Slipsheet,
Att: 56 Exhibit 56- Slipsheet,
Att: 57 Exhibit 57- Slipsheet,
Att: 58 Exhibit 58 - T. Kershaw Trial Testimony 9.13.2024,
Att: 59 Exhibit 59- Slipsheet,
Att: 60 Exhibit 60- Slipsheet,
Att: 61 Exhibit 61- Slipsheet,
Att: 62 Exhibit 62- Slipsheet
956 956 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 05/02 8:18 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (185 in 1:21-cv-07034-PKC, 955 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Certify Class , to appoint Class representatives, and appoint co-lead counsel for the Classes . . Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
Related: [-]
955 955 motion Certify Class Fri 05/02 8:14 PM
MOTION to Certify Class , to appoint Class representatives, and appoint co-lead counsel for the Classes . Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
Related: [-]
954 954 motion Seal Fri 05/02 8:09 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law and certain exhibits to Earnhardt Declaration in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Philip C. Korologos dated May 2, 2025. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
Related: [-]
953 953 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/02 6:33 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Philip C. Korologos dated May 2, 2025. Document filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Korologos, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion, United States v. Google LLC, No. 23-cv-108-LMB (E.D. Va. Apr. 17, 2025)
952 952 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/02 6:24 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment as to Informs Third Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated May 2, 2025. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC, Youtube L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:23-cv-01530-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
Related: [-]
951 951 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/02 6:22 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Summary Judgment [REDACTED] addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Craig M. Reiser dated May 2, 2025. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC Related [+]
Related: [-] iser, Craig
950 950 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/02 6:20 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment as to Advertisers Consolidated Advertiser Class Action Complaint, addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated May 2, 2025. Document filed by Alphabet Inc.(a Delaware Corporation), Google LLC, Alphabet Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07001-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
Related: [-]
949 949 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/02 6:14 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment as to Publishers First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Justina K. Sessions dated May 2, 2025. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC, Google L.L.C, Youtube L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-07034-PKC.(Sessions, Justina)
Related: [-]
948 948 misc Letter Fri 05/02 5:48 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from John Thorne dated May 2, 2025 re: Request for Leave to File Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Associated Newspapers Ltd., Gannett Co., Inc., Mail Media, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 1:21-cv-03446-PKC, 1:23-cv-05177-PKC.(Thorne, John)
Related: [-]
947 947 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/02 9:11 AM
ORDER granting946 Motion for Isabel Velez to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
946 946 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 1:34 PM
MOTION for Isabel Velez to Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+] . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC..(Velez, Isabel)
Related: [-] ceipt No. ANYSDC-31015987
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Isabel Velez in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 3 Proposed Order for Admission of Pro Hac Vice
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 05/01 3:10 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 946 MOTION for Isabel Velez to Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
Related: [-] ceipt No. ANYSDC-31015987