Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-05017

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Daniel P Collins
Case #: 2:21-ap-00099
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Apr 19, 2021
Terminated:Nov 24, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
ALAMO CHANDLER LLC
519 E. HORSESHOE PLACE
CHANDLER, AZ 85249
Represented By
ALAMO CHANDLER LLC
contact info
Defendant
ALAMO GILBERT LLC
519 E. HORSESHOE PLACE
CHANDLER, AZ 85249
Represented By
ALAMO GILBERT LLC
contact info
Defendant
ALAMO TEMPE LLC
519 E. HORSESHOE PLACE
CHANDLER, AZ 85249
Represented By
ALAMO TEMPE LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas LLC
Forrester & Worth, PLLC 2800 N. Central Ave., Ste. 1200
Phoenix, AZ 85004
Represented By
JOHN R. WORTH
Forrester & Worth, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:05 PM MST
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
court Close Adversary Wed 11/24 8:59 AM
Adversary Terminated . (ETS)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 06, 2021
19 19 other Stipulation for Dismissal of Complaint Mon 09/06 11:37 AM
Stipulation for Dismissal of Complaint Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by LEIB M LERNER of 333 S HOPE ST 16TH FL on behalf of Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas LLC. Related [+] (LERNER, LEIB)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
18 18 order oGranting Tue 08/17 10:42 AM
ORDER on Fourth Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint signed on 8/17/2021 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 16 Stipulation
Monday, August 16, 2021
17 17 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Mon 08/16 5:58 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order on Fourth Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer filed by SIERRA M MINDER of SACKS TIERNEY on behalf of ALAMO CHANDLER LLC, ALAMO GILBERT LLC, ALAMO TEMPE LLC, Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas LLC Related [+]. (MINDER, SIERRA)
Related: [-] 16 Stipulation
16 16 other Stipulation Mon 08/16 5:55 PM
Stipulation Fourth Stipulation to Extend Time in Which Defendants May Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by SIERRA M MINDER of SACKS TIERNEY on behalf of ALAMO CHANDLER LLC, ALAMO GILBERT LLC, ALAMO TEMPE LLC, Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas LLC. Related [+] (MINDER, SIERRA)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
15 15 order oGranting Wed 07/14 3:06 PM
ORDER On Third Stipulation To Extend Time For Defendants To Respond To Complaint signed on 7/14/2021 Related [+] . (JMM)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulation
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
14 14 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Tue 07/13 12:15 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order //Order on Third Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by SIERRA M MINDER of SACKS TIERNEY on behalf of ALAMO CHANDLER LLC, ALAMO GILBERT LLC, ALAMO TEMPE LLC Related [+]. (MINDER, SIERRA)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulation
13 13 other Stipulation Tue 07/13 12:10 PM
Stipulation //Third Stipulation to Extend Time in Which Defendants May Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by SIERRA M MINDER of SACKS TIERNEY on behalf of ALAMO CHANDLER LLC, ALAMO GILBERT LLC, ALAMO TEMPE LLC. Related [+] (MINDER, SIERRA)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation,10 Stipulation
Thursday, June 03, 2021
12 12 order oApproving Fri 06/04 7:44 AM
ORDER Approving signed on 6/3/2021 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulation
11 11 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Thu 06/03 1:55 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order // Order on Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by SIERRA M MINDER of SACKS TIERNEY on behalf of ALAMO CHANDLER LLC, ALAMO GILBERT LLC, ALAMO TEMPE LLC Related [+]. (MINDER, SIERRA)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulation
10 10 other Stipulation Thu 06/03 1:51 PM
Stipulation // Second Stipulation to Extend Time in Which Defendants May Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by SIERRA M MINDER of SACKS TIERNEY on behalf of ALAMO CHANDLER LLC, ALAMO GILBERT LLC, ALAMO TEMPE LLC. Related [+] (MINDER, SIERRA)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation
Thursday, May 20, 2021
9 9 order oApproving Thu 05/20 2:59 PM
ORDER signed on 5/20/2021 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
8 8 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Wed 05/19 5:56 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order on Stipulation to Extend Time filed by SIERRA M MINDER of SACKS TIERNEY on behalf of ALAMO CHANDLER LLC, ALAMO GILBERT LLC, ALAMO TEMPE LLC, Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas LLC Related [+]. (MINDER, SIERRA)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation
7 7 other Stipulation Wed 05/19 5:49 PM
Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond filed by SIERRA M MINDER of SACKS TIERNEY on behalf of ALAMO CHANDLER LLC, ALAMO GILBERT LLC, ALAMO TEMPE LLC, Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas LLC. (MINDER, SIERRA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
6 6 other Certificate of Service Tue 04/20 4:23 PM
Amended Certificate of Service filed by JOHN R. WORTH of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas LLC. Related [+] (WORTH, JOHN)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Summons Issued,5 Certificate of Service
5 5 other Certificate of Service Tue 04/20 2:15 PM
Certificate of Service filed by JOHN R. WORTH of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas LLC. Related [+] (WORTH, JOHN)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Summons Issued
4 4 court Summons Issued (Form) Tue 04/20 8:01 AM
Summons Issued . (RDC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 19, 2021
3 3 other Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 04/19 1:33 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed by JOHN R. WORTH of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas LLC. Related [+] (WORTH, JOHN)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/19 1:28 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by JOHN R. WORTH of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas LLC. (WORTH, JOHN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/19 1:23 PM
Adversary case 2:21-ap-00099. Complaint (350.00 fee) against ALAMO CHANDLER LLC, ALAMO GILBERT LLC, ALAMO TEMPE LLC filed by JOHN R. WORTH of FORRESTER & WORTH, PLLC on behalf of Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas LLC Nature of Suit: 72 (Injunctive relief - other) 91 (Declaratory judgment) 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (WORTH, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1-3