Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Michael L Brown
Referred: John K Larkins, III
Case #: 1:21-cv-01850
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Race Discrimination
Case Filed:May 04, 2021
Terminated:Oct 23, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Oct 31, 2021 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Dimerco Express USA Corp.
Represented By
Chad Allan Shultz
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Julia Christine Glasgow
The Home Depot
contact info
James Fielding
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Leslie Kali Eason
Gordon & Rees
contact info
Canon T. Corbitt
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Steven M. Stastny
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani - La
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenny Faulk
Represented By
Victor Severin Roberts
Barrett & Farahany, LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 10 2024
OPINION AND ORDER. The Court DENIES Defendant's Consolidated Post-Trial Motions 175. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 10th day of July, 2024. (pdt)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, January 13, 2025
240 240 appeal USCA Order Mon 01/13 4:01 PM
USCA Order: The parties Joint Motion to Correct and Supplement Record on Appeal is GRANTED re:224 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dimerco Express USA Corp. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit, Case Number 24-12603 HH. (pjm)
Related: [-]