Original Case: 1:21-cv-01850

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-prici-12603
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2024 4:17 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
DIMERCO EXPRESS USA CORP.
Represented By
Canon T. Corbitt
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Nicholas Boyd
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Steven Michael Stastny
Stastny Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Cynthia Grace Burnside
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Ilene L. Pabian
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
David Gary Jones
Olsen & Bruggemann - CA
contact info
Chad A. Shultz
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
KENNY FAULK
Represented By
Amanda A. Farahany
Barrett & Farahany, LLP
contact info
Benjamin J. Rollins
Barrett & Farahany, LLP
contact info
Victor Severin Roberts
Barrett & Farahany, LLP
contact info
Patrick James Reid
Barrett & Farahany, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/19/2024 4:17 AM EDT
Friday, August 09, 2024
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Dimerco Express USA Corp. on 08/08/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/03/2024 as to Appellant Dimerco Express USA Corp.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/13/2024 as to Appellee Kenny Faulk.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 3 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 2 pgs Judgment DE# 223
Att: 4 1 pgs Judgment DE# 222
Att: 5 20 pgs Order DE# 221
Att: 6 52 pgs Order DE# 220
Att: 7 2 pgs Judgment DE# 161
Att: 8 4 pgs Verdict DE# 160