Kellier v. Billups et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Laura Taylor Swain |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-03921 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 30, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 28, 2021 4:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Steve Banks
|
|
Defendant
Samaritan Village
|
|
Defendant
Rodriguez
|
|
Defendant
Omahoney
|
|
Defendant
NAICA Facility
|
|
Defendant
Montanga
|
|
Defendant
Martin
|
|
Defendant
Julius Doe
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Mr. Jackson
|
|
Defendant
Hyler
|
|
Defendant
Bill De Blasio
|
|
Defendant
DHS Facility
|
|
Defendant
Mrs. Cruz
|
|
Defendant
Coaltion for the Homeless
|
|
Defendant
Mr. Clinton
|
|
Defendant
Cheung
|
|
Defendant
Billups
|
|
Defendant
Bently
|
|
Defendant
Anthony Acosta
|
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Kellier
P.O. Box 23678
Brooklyn, NY 11201 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, August 12, 2022 | ||
misc
Received Returned Mail
Fri 08/12 3:40 PM
Received returned mail re:17 Order of Dismissal,18 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint). Mail was addressed to Joshua Kellier, P.O. Box 23678, Brooklyn, NY 11201 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return To Sender Attempted - Not Known Unable To Forward Return To Sender. (vn) |
||
Wednesday, April 13, 2022 | ||
misc
Mailing Receipt
Wed 04/13 8:58 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 17-18. Mailed to: Joshua Kellier P.O. Box 23678 Brooklyn, NY 11201. Mailed: (dsh) |
||
Monday, April 11, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint)
Tue 04/12 9:25 AM
CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/11/22) (rdz) |
|
Att: 1 Pro Se Appeal Package | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Tue 04/12 9:22 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: By order dated June 14, 2021, the Court directed Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within sixty days. That order specified that failure to comply would result in dismissal of the complaint. On July 14, 2021, Plaintiff filed a notice of interlocutory appeal. The Second Circuit dismissed the appeal as frivolous. No. 21-1706 (2d Cir. Jan. 13, 2022). On February 8, 2022, the Court granted Plaintiff 30 days to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff has not filed an amended complaint. Accordingly, the complaint, filed in forma pauperis (IFP) under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1), is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/11/22) (rdz) |
|
Tuesday, February 08, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order 30 Days Amended Complaint (case opening)
Tue 02/08 10:06 AM
ORDER: The Court grants Plaintiff an extension of time to file an amended complaint as outlined in the June 14, 2021 order. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint within thirty days of the date of this order. No further extensions of time will be granted. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, see 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/8/2022) (sac) |
|
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Tue 02/08 10:54 AM
Mailed a copy of16 Order 30 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to Joshua Kellier, P.O. Box 23678, Brooklyn, NY 11201. (dsh) |
||
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 02/03 10:01 AM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Joshua Kellier,13 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Joshua Kellier. USCA Case Number 21-1706 Appellant, pro se, moves for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED because it "lacks an arguable basis either in law or in fact." Neitzke v. Williams, 490 U.S. 319, 325 (1989); see also 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)... Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 2/3/2022..(nd) |
|
Friday, July 16, 2021 | ||
appeal
Appeal Remark
Fri 07/16 1:31 PM
Appeal Remark as to14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Joshua Kellier. USCA Second Circuit may treat this14 NOA as a duplicate since Mr. Kellier already filed his13 NOA from the same11 Order. (tp) |
||
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Fri 07/16 1:32 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (tp) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
Fri 07/16 1:33 PM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for14 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Joshua Kellier were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) |
||
Wednesday, July 14, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
Fri 07/16 1:29 PM
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from11 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening). Document filed by Joshua Kellier. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp) |
|
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 07/13 3:35 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:13 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (tp) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
Tue 07/13 3:36 PM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for13 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Joshua Kellier were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) |
||
Monday, July 12, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
Tue 07/13 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from11 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening). Document filed by Joshua Kellier. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp) |
|
Monday, June 28, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Tue 06/29 12:00 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Joshua Kellier, dated 6/19/21 re: "MAIL FRAUD AND VIOLATIONS OF THE LAW" - Plaintiff told Mrs. Shaw that he mailed his complaint against the DHS on 4/6/21. Mrs. Shaw refused to perform her duty of proper record keeping and put it down that the plaintiff filed his record on 4/29/21, rather than 4/6/21. Plaintiff's complaint was still in the package that postmarked the date the office received his complaint (see exhibit) etc. Document filed by Joshua Kellier.(sc) |
|
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte
Wed 06/16 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) |
||
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Tue 06/15 3:43 PM
Mailed a copy of11 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to Joshua Kellier, P.O. Box 23678, Brooklyn, NY 11201. (dsh) |
||
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
20
pgs
order
Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening)
Tue 06/15 3:08 PM
ORDER TO AMEND: Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 21-CV-3921 (LTS). An Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The motions for counsel and injunctive relief are denied without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/14/2021) (sac) |
|
Wednesday, May 12, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Granting IFP Application
Wed 05/12 2:51 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/12/2021) (vn) |
|
Friday, April 30, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Brief
Wed 05/05 10:50 AM
BRIEF in Support of Motion for Poo Persons Waiver, IFP IN Forma Pauperis. Document filed by Joshua Kellier..(rdz) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Brief
Wed 05/05 10:36 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRO BONO COUNSEL. Document filed by Joshua Kellier..(rdz) |
|
7 | 7
respoth
Affidavit in Support (non-motion)
Wed 05/05 10:30 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Support of MOTION FOR POOR PERSON VAIVER, IFP-IN-FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Joshua Kellier. (rdz) |
|
6 | 6
respoth
Affidavit in Support (non-motion)
Wed 05/05 10:15 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion of Pro Bono Counsel. Document filed by Joshua Kellier..(rdz) |
|
5 | 5
13
pgs
respoth
Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion)
Wed 05/05 10:12 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of COMPLAINT. Document filed by Joshua Kellier..(rdz) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/05 10:07 AM
NOTICE of MOTION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRO POOR PERSON'S WAIVER, IFP IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Joshua Kellier..(rdz) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/05 10:05 AM
NOTICE of MOTION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRO BONO COUNSEL. Document filed by Joshua Kellier..(rdz) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/05 9:55 AM
COMPLAINT against Anthony Acosta, Steve Banks, Bently, Billups, Cheung, Clinton, Coaltion for the Homeless, Cruz, DHS Facility, Bill De Blasio, Hyler, Jackson, John Doe, Julius Doe, Martin, Montanga, NAICA Facility, Omahoney, Rodriguez. Document filed by Joshua Kellier..(rdz) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 05/05 9:54 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Joshua Kellier..(rdz) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 05/05 9:55 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz) |