Washington Western District Court
Judge:John H Chun
Case #: 3:21-cv-05351
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 11, 2021
Terminated:Mar 29, 2023
Case in other court:Clark County Superior Court, 21-00002-00797-06
Last checked: Sunday Nov 07, 2021 2:14 AM PST
Defendant
Selene Finance LP
Represented By
Anthony C Soldato
Klinedinst Pc (seattle)
contact info
Gregor A. Hensrude
Klinedinst Pc (seattle)
contact info
Defendant
Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
Represented By
Anthony C Soldato
Klinedinst Pc (seattle)
contact info
Gregor A. Hensrude
Klinedinst Pc (seattle)
contact info
Plaintiff
Edward Fogg
Represented By
John David Nellor
J. D. Nellor, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Fogg
Represented By
John David Nellor
J. D. Nellor, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, October 03, 2024
27 27 appeal Mandate of USCA Thu 10/03 12:29 PM
MANDATE OF USCA 23-35289 as to24 Notice of Appeal, filed by Edward Fogg, Maria Fogg,26 Memorandum of USCA. The Judgment from USCA takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. AFFIRMED (CJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
26 26 appeal Memorandum/Opinion from USCA Wed 09/11 10:05 AM
MEMORANDUM FROM USCA 23-35289 (NOT THE MANDATE) as to24 Notice of Appeal, filed by Edward Fogg, Maria Fogg. AFFIRMED . (RE)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
25 25 appeal Time Schedule Order Appeal Number from USCA Mon 05/01 11:12 AM
TIME SCHEDULE ORDER/USCA CASE NUMBER 23-35289 as to24 Notice of Appeal, filed by Edward Fogg, Maria Fogg. (RE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
24 24 appeal Notice of Appeal to Circuit Thu 04/27 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit re20 Judgment by Court,19 Order to Remand Case, by Plaintiffs Edward Fogg, Maria Fogg. $505, receipt number AWAWDC-7986574 (cc: USCA) (Grimm, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/26 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew B Grimm on behalf of Plaintiffs Edward Fogg, Maria Fogg. (Grimm, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
22 22 misc Receipt Mon 04/24 3:26 PM
RECEIPT from Clark County Superior Court re21 Remand Letter to State Court. (SB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
21 21 misc Remand Letter Tue 04/11 8:53 AM
LETTER to Clark County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court. (SB) (letter, order, and docket sent via USPS to Clark County Superior Court)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
20 20 order Judgment by Court Wed 03/29 9:17 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT. All federal claims are DISMISSED with prejudice and all state-law claims are REMANDED to the Clark County Superior Court of the State of Washington. Dkt. #19 . To the extent that the Court's order represents a partial judgment, the Court finds that there is no just reason for delay because no claims remain in federal court, so the Courts order shall be deemed a final judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). (SB)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
19 19 10 pgs order Order to Remand Case Mon 03/27 4:04 PM
ORDER: The Court DISMISSES with prejudice all federal claims and REMANDS the remaining state-law claims to the Clark County Superior Court of the State of Washington (Dkt. #13 ). The Court STRIKES as moot the pending motion in limine (Dkt. #18 ). Signed by Judge John H. Chun. Per LCR 3(i), case will be remanded on the 15th day following the date of this Order, on 4/11/2023. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
18 18 motion In Limine Mon 03/20 3:28 PM
MOTIONS IN LIMINE No. 1 to Exclude Alleged Lost Refinance Damages , filed by Defendants Selene Finance LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. Noting Date 5/1/2023, (Hensrude, Gregor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, March 02, 2023
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 03/02 4:02 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendants Selene Finance LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, TO RESPONSE to13 MOTION for Summary Judgment(Hensrude, Gregor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, February 27, 2023
16 16 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/27 9:17 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Edward Fogg, Maria Fogg, to13 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Nellor, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Edward Fogg,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit K,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit L,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit M
Monday, February 06, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Mon 02/06 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Gregor A. Hensrude. Filed by Defendants Selene Finance LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. (Hensrude, Gregor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
14 14 respm Declaration Tue 01/31 4:47 PM
DECLARATION of Gregor A. Hensrude filed by Defendants Selene Finance LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment(Hensrude, Gregor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit J
13 13 motion Summary Judgment Tue 01/31 4:22 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendants Selene Finance LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 3/3/2023, (Hensrude, Gregor)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
12 12 order JHC Minute Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates (FORM) Fri 10/14 3:59 PM
AMENDED MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge John H. Chun; Length of Trial: *4 days*. Bench Trial is set for 5/1/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge John H. Chun. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/2/2022, Discovery Motions due by 12/2/2022, Discovery completed by 1/3/2023, Dispositive motions due by 1/31/2023, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 3/2/2023, Motions in Limine due by 3/20/2023, Pretrial Order due by 4/10/2023, Deposition Designations due by 4/12/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge John H. Chun. Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/24/2023, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 4/24/2023. (AD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
11 11 order JHC Minute Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates (FORM) Tue 05/03 4:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge John H. Chun; Length of Trial: *4 days*. Bench Trial is set for 5/1/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge John H. Chun. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/2/2022, Discovery Motions due by 12/2/2022, Discovery completed by 1/3/2023, Dispositive motions due by 1/31/2023, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 3/2/2023, Motions in Limine due by 3/20/2023, Pretrial Order due by 4/10/2023, Deposition Designations due by 4/12/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge John H. Chun. Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/24/2023, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 4/24/2023. (AD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
10 10 misc Joint Status Report Thu 04/14 1:06 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4. (Nellor, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 04/11 1:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge John H. Chun for all further proceedings. Judge Benjamin H. Settle no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (DK)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 04/04 12:12 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Extension requested to continue settlement negotiations; Joint Status Report due by 4/18/2022. (DK)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/07 11:21 AM
ORDER GRANTING7 STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND PRETRIAL DEADLINES; signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/4/2022. Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/11/2022. Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2022. (SP)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
7 7 motion Stipulated Motion Fri 02/04 3:16 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Extend Pretrial Deadlines , filed by Defendants Selene Finance LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. Noting Date 2/4/2022, (Hensrude, Gregor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 11/24 9:38 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: SECOND request from all parties to extend deadlines to allow continued settlement negotiations: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/28/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/4/2022, Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2022. (DK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/18 10:26 AM
Deadlines reset to allow time for settlement negotiations: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/22/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/29/2021, Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2021. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
6 6 order BHS - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Fri 05/21 3:34 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 8/19/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/5/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/12/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Tue 05/18 3:44 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re:1 Notice of Removal, . by Selene Finance LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Hensrude, Gregor)
Related: [-]
4 4 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/18 3:34 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Selene Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Selene Ventures GP LLC, Other Affiliate Selene Ventures LLC, Other Affiliate Mortgage Solutions Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Pretium Partners LLC for Selene Finance LP. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Selene Finance LP (Hensrude, Gregor)
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/18 3:31 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent WSFS Financial Corporation for Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB (Hensrude, Gregor)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
2 2 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Fri 05/14 10:20 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 05/14 10:18 AM
Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
Related: [-]
utility Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Fri 05/14 10:49 AM
NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) Selene Finance LP and Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/21/2021. (SP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 05/11 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County Superior Court, case number 21 2-00797 06; Related [+], filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, Selene Finance LP.(Hensrude, Gregor)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-7079965
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet