Original Case: 3:21-cv-05351

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-pr-35289
Typeprisoner / state / civil rights
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday May 02, 2023 1:31 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
SELENE FINANCE LP, a foreign limited liability company
Represented By
Anthony C. Soldato
Klinedinst, PC
contact info
Gregor Hensrude
Klinedinst, PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB, trustee for Premium Mortgage Acquisition Trust doing business as Christina Trus
Represented By
Anthony C. Soldato
Klinedinst, PC
contact info
Gregor Hensrude
Klinedinst, PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
EDWARD FOGG
Represented By
John D. Nellor
J. D. Nellor, PC
contact info
Andrew Grimm
Digital Justice Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARIA FOGG
Represented By
John D. Nellor
J. D. Nellor, PC
contact info
Andrew Grimm
Digital Justice Foundation
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2023 1:19 AM PDT
Friday, April 28, 2023
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Edward Fogg and Maria Fogg Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/05/2023. Appellants Edward Fogg and Maria Fogg opening brief due 06/26/2023. Appellees Selene Finance LP and Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB answering brief due 07/26/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12704872] (ABT) [Entered: 04/28/2023 10:35 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 1 pgs Medition Letter
Att: 3 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire
Att: 4 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 5 22 pgs Attorney Appeals Packet