Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services et al v. City of Lubbock, Texas
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James Wesley Hendrix |
Case #: | 5:21-cv-00114 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 17, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 13, 2021 2:55 AM CST |
Amicus
Project Destiny Lubbock, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Lubbock, Texas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
G. Sealy Massingill, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
61 | 61
appeal
USCA Order
Fri 01/21 3:14 PM
ORDER of USCA as to59 Notice of Appeal filed by Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, G. Sealy Massingill, M.D. Under Fed. R. App. P. 42(B), the appeal is dismissed as of January 21, 2022, pursuant to appellant's motion. (bdg) |