Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:21-ap-03025
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:May 19, 2021
Terminated:Apr 27, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Captain Georges of South Carolina, LP
Represented By
Captain Georges of South Carolina, LP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Paula S. Beran
Tavenner & Beran, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
9 9 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 04/27 12:41 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation Wed 04/27 9:49 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal By Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee and Between Defendant filed by Paula S. Beran of Tavenner & Beran, PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 28, 2022
7 7 misc Certification Fri 01/28 10:48 AM
Certification Mediator's Report Pursuant to Procedures Order filed by Kelly Megan Barnhart of Roussos & Barnhart, PLC on behalf of Kelly M. Barnhart. (Barnhart, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 23, 2021
6 6 answer None Fri 07/23 2:11 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Peter G. Zemanian of Zemanian Law Group on behalf of Captain Georges of South Carolina, LP. (Zemanian, Peter)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/07 2:54 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Paula S. Beran of Tavenner & Beran, PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-] related document(s)3 Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY
Friday, May 21, 2021
4 4 court Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Proceeding Filing Fee Fri 05/21 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Filing Fee. Receipt Number 118898. Fee Amount $350.00. (stehlem)
Related: [-]
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Fri 05/21 3:12 PM
Summons and notice issued to Captain Georges of South Carolina, LP Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Thursday, May 20, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 05/20 11:17 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 21-03025 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number Check, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (Jones)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 05/19 5:13 PM
Adversary case 21-03025 Complaint against Captain Georges of South Carolina, LP filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-]